Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-43441

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:21-ap-01081
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2021
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company
2244 Westchester Avenue
Bronx, NY 10462
Represented By
Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.
GLEICHENHAUS, MARCHESE & WEISHAAR, PC c/o Scott J. Bogucki, Esq. 43 COURT ST STE 930
BUFFALO, NY 14202
Represented By
Scott J. Bogucki
Gleichenhaus, Marchese & Weishaar, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/09 1:09 PM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Mon 09/09 1:16 PM
Pre-Trial Marked Off; Notice of Dismissal Filed. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/09 3:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1081 Closed (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 07/30 4:53 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/09/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 05/08 4:10 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/31/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 03/18 2:26 PM
ELEVENTH Stipulation and Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint pursuant to the Initial Stipulation by ninety (90) days from March 15, 2024 to, and including, June 14, 2024. Related [+]. Answer Due 6/14/2024. Signed on 3/18/2024 (aac)
Related: [-] l Doc #26
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 03/13 4:44 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by Scott J. Bogucki on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 02/26 4:17 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/09/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, January 18, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Thu 01/18 10:47 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing. Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/28/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (drk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
25 25 order Extending Time to File Answer Tue 12/26 2:58 PM
TENTH Stipulation and Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint pursuant to the Initial Stipulation by ninety (90) days from December 15, 2023 to, and including, March 15, 2024 . Answer Due 3/15/2024. Signed on 12/26/2023 (aac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Fri 12/15 5:52 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS AND PONCE BANK MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 12/04 5:07 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, September 28, 2023
23 23 order Extending Time to File Answer Thu 09/28 10:48 AM
Ninth Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and 70-05 Realty Inc. and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint pursuant to the Initial Stipulation by ninety (90) days from September 15, 2023 to, and including, December 15, 2023. Answer Due 12/15/2023 Related [+]. SO ORDERED on 9/28/2023 (dnb)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 09/26 10:51 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/06/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Tue 09/19 5:16 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 07/31 2:33 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/27/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, June 30, 2023
21 21 order Extending Time to File Answer Wed 07/05 9:23 AM
EIGHTH Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by ninety (90) days from June 15, 2023 to, and including, September 15, 2023. Answer Due 9/15/2023. Signed on 6/30/2023 (aac)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 06/19 1:11 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by Scott J. Bogucki on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Fri 06/02 1:56 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/02/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, April 17, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 04/17 2:22 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/07/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, April 10, 2023
19 19 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 04/10 3:49 PM
SEVENTH Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by ninety (90) days from March 13, 2023 to, and including, June 15, 2023. Answer Due 6/15/2023. Signed on 4/10/2023 (aac)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 03/27 1:03 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 03/27 1:00 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 02/14 10:54 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
16 16 order Extending Time to File Answer Wed 12/21 8:10 AM
SIXTH Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by ninety (90) days from December 12, 2022 to, and including, March 13, 2023. Answer Due 3/13/2023. Signed on 12/20/2022 (aac)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 12/12 4:26 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to extend time to respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 12/06 8:32 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 09/28 9:12 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, September 19, 2022
14 14 order Extending Time to File Answer Tue 09/20 10:56 AM
Fifth Stipulation and Agreed Order by and between The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company Extending the deadline to submit a motion or answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by ninety (90) days from September 12, 2022 to, and including, December 12, 2022. Answer Due 12/12/2022. Signed on 9/19/2022 (aac)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 09/12 1:12 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to extend time to respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. Related [+]. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 08/02 3:23 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/28/2022 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, July 01, 2022
12 12 order Extending Time to File Answer Fri 07/01 3:59 PM
Fourth Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Undersigned Parties Extending the current deadline for Defendant Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Answer Due 9/12/2022. Signed on 7/1/2022 (aac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 06/14 8:20 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, June 10, 2022
11 11 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 06/10 10:53 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from June 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. to August 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Fri 06/10 9:25 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS AND PONCE BANK MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY to Extending time to Respond to Complaint to September 5, 2022. Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. Related [+]. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, May 09, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 05/09 2:36 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/29/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, March 24, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 03/25 10:32 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearance: Scott J. Bogucki (Counsel to Plaintiff); Hearing Adjourned to 05/11/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, March 17, 2022
9 9 order Extending Time to File Answer Fri 03/18 9:08 AM
Third Stipulation and Agreed by and between Order Extending The Committee and Ponce hereby agree and consent to extend the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint pursuant to the InitialStipulation by ninety (90) days from March 7, 2022 to, and including, June 7, 2022. Answer Due 6/7/2022. Signed on 3/17/2022 (sem)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Mon 03/07 12:57 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. Related [+]. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Mon 12/27 10:22 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearance: Scott J. Bogucki (Counsel to Plaintiff); Hearing Adjourned to 03/24/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
7 7 order Extending Time to File Answer Tue 12/07 2:31 PM
Second Stipulation and Order by and between the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company that that Committee and Ponce hereby agree and consent to extend the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint pursuant to the Initial Stipulation by ninety (90) days from December 7, 2021 to, and including, March 7, 2022. Answer Due 3/7/2022. Signed on 12/7/2021 (sem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 12/01 12:22 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Time to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc.. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 10/19 9:29 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearance: Scott J. Bogucki (Counsel to Plaintiff); Hearing Adjourned to 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, September 17, 2021
5 5 order Extending Time to File Answer Fri 09/17 12:54 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order by and between the Plaintiff and Defendant that this Stipulation shall become effective upon the date that an order approving this Stipulation is entered by the Court. The Committee and PONCE hereby agree and consent to extend the current deadline to submit a motion or an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by ninety (90) days from September 8, 2021 to, and including, December 7, 2021.. Answer Due 12/7/2021. Signed on 9/17/2021 (sem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Tue 09/07 2:02 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between the Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company to Extend Deadline to Respond Filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Realty Inc., a/k/a 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. Related [+]. (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 16, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/16 12:22 PM
Summons Served on Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company 8/13/2021 . (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Mon 08/09 11:14 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company Answer Due: 9/8/2021 Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (fmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/06 11:49 AM
Adversary case 1 21-01081 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of 41-23 Haight Street Realty, Inc. against Ponce Bank Mutual Holding Company. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Bogucki, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 08/06 6:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK:1 21-01081 nhl] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A20263079. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1