California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01398
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2021
Terminated:Nov 21, 2023
Case in other court:San Joaquin County Superior court, STK-CV-UWT-20-07491
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 02, 2022 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Crate & Barrel Distribution Center
Defendant
Euromarket Designs, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret Leah Cameron
Cdf Labor Law LLP
contact info
Corinne Biller, PHV
Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Sonya Rosenberg, PHV
Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Enrique Lopez
Defendant
Alejandro Sanchez
Represented By
Margaret Leah Cameron
Cdf Labor Law LLP
contact info
Corinne Biller, PHV
Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Sonya Rosenberg, PHV
Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimahni Duncan
Represented By
H. Jack Bazerkanian
C&b Law Group LLP
contact info
Tiffany Ariavand
C&b Law Group LLP
contact info
H. Jack Bazerkanian, NCAED
C&b Law Group, LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 02 2021
ORDER GRANTING 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/01/21. Added attorney Corinne Biller, PHV for Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
GPO Sep 02 2021
ORDER GRANTING 8 Application for Pro Hac Vic signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/01/21. Added attorney Sonya Rosenberg, PHV for Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jan 04 2022
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/3/2022. (Huang, H)
GPO Nov 08 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/2022 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Fact Discovery Cut-Off is 2/3/2023. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/19/2023. Rebuttal Expert Witnesses exchanged by 6/16/2023. All Expert Discovery completed by 7/14/2023. Dispositive Motions heard by 4/28/2023. (Coll, A)
GPO Mar 02 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/1/2023 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Complete Expert Disclosures by 7/18/2023; Exchange Rebuttal Expert Witnesses by 8/15/2023; Expert Discovery Cutoff due by 9/12/2023; and Dispositive Motions heard by 6/30/2023. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Mar 21 2023
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2023 ORDERING The last day to complete expert disclosures to 12/22/2023. Last day to exchange rebuttal expert witnesses by 1/19/2024. Expert Discovery due by 2/16/2024, and Last day to hear dispositive motion 12/1/2023, (which if any, shall be filed by 10/27/2023).(Reader, L)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
26 26 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/21 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/21/2023: This action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, ECF No.25 . Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED, and this case is CLOSED with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/10 11:00 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Kimahni Duncan.(Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/21 1:02 PM
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2023 ORDERING The last day to complete expert disclosures to 12/22/2023. Last day to exchange rebuttal expert witnesses by 1/19/2024. Expert Discovery due by 2/16/2024, and Last day to hear dispositive motion 12/1/2023, (which if any, shall be filed by 10/27/2023) Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
23 23 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/15 2:14 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying the Initial Scheduling Order by Euromarket Designs, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
22 22 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/02 11:51 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/1/2023 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Complete Expert Disclosures by 7/18/2023; Exchange Rebuttal Expert Witnesses by 8/15/2023; Expert Discovery Cutoff due by 9/12/2023; and Dispositive Motions heard by 6/30/2023. (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 02/27 10:52 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify Scheduling Order by Euromarket Designs, Inc.. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
20 20 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 11/08 12:27 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/2022 MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Fact Discovery Cut-Off is 2/3/2023. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/19/2023. Rebuttal Expert Witnesses exchanged by 6/16/2023. All Expert Discovery completed by 7/14/2023. Dispositive Motions heard by 4/28/2023. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/31 5:56 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modification of the Initial Scheduling Order by Kimahni Duncan. (Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
18 18 order Protective Order Tue 01/04 10:19 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/3/2022. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/30 3:10 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Euromarket Designs, Inc..(Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 16, 2021
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 12/16 3:49 PM
MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held via videoconference before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/2021, and FRCP 16 BENCH ORDER: Plaintiff's Counsel, Tiffany Ariavand, present. Defendant's Counsel, Corinne Biller and Leah Cameron, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, the court ORDERED the following pre-trial case schedule: Initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) shall be completed by 12/17/2021; fact discovery shall be completed by 11/4/2022; expert disclosures shall be completed by 2/17/2023; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 3/17/2023; all expert discovery shall be completed by 4/14/2023; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 12/9/2022. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery-only protective order within fourteen (14) days. Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the parties will notify the court whether they request a court settlement conference date or referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP) prior the close of fact discovery. The parties shall file said notification or request for referral jointly, in writing. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's standing scheduling order for Civil Cases filed concurrently herewith are incorporated therein. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Tiphanne Crowe. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
15 15 misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Fri 12/10 9:46 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 12/16/2021 Status Conference hearing by Kimahni Duncan. (Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Fri 12/10 2:35 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 12/16/2021 Status Conference hearing by Euromarket Designs, Inc.. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
13 13 misc Scheduling Report Thu 12/02 2:14 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT by Euromarket Designs, Inc.. (Biller, Corinne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/15 3:42 PM
ANSWER by Euromarket Designs, Inc..(Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/02 11:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Application for Pro Hac Vic signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/01/21. Added attorney Sonya Rosenberg, PHV for Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/02 11:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/01/21. Added attorney Corinne Biller, PHV for Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/01 8:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kimahni Duncan. Attorney Ariavand, Tiffany added.(Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
8 8 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Mon 08/16 12:34 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez for attorney Sonya Rosenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9765188) (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Mon 08/16 12:31 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez for attorney Corinne Biller to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9765176) (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 08/13 2:31 PM
STIPULATION regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Compliant by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
5 5 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/10 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez re3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/10 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Fri 08/06 2:03 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/06 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Euromarket Design, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez re1 Notice of Removal,. (Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 08/06 12:32 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UWT-0007491 by Euromarket Design, Inc., Alejandro Sanchez. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9750371)(Cameron, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Victoria Donati,
Att: 3 Declaration of M. Leah Cameron,
Att: 4 Certificate of Interested Entities and Persons