Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:21-cv-03185
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2021
Terminated:Sep 24, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 01, 2022 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
American Accounts & Advisers, Inc.
Plaintiff
Robin G. Dickinson
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Berry
Berry & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 24, 2021
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 09/24 9:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/24 9:14 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/23 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robin G. Dickinson (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 08/06 1:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Robin G. Dickinson. (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 08/06 2:02 PM
Clerks Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Robin G. Dickinson. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/06 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robin G. Dickinson (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11164578)(ayw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet