California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-mj-02808
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2021
Terminated:Aug 05, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 08, 2021 12:26 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Shin
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez (1)
Terminated: 08/05/2021
Represented By
Artemis Spyridonidis
Law Office Of Artemis Spyridonidis
contact info
Defendant
Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez (2)
Terminated: 08/05/2021
Represented By
Danielle Renee Peay
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/08/2021 12:43 AM PDT
Thursday, July 08, 2021
Arrest of Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez, Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez (no document attached) (lrc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez, Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez.(lrc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez, Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez: Initial Appearance set for 7/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. (no document attached) (aef)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Initial Appearance as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez(1), Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez(2) held on 7/9/2021. The Court accepts oral proffer and confirms the appointment of counsel as to each defendant. Appointed Attorney Artemis Spyridonidis(n/a) for Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez(1) and Danielle Renee Peay(n/a) for Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez(2). Bond set as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1500 cash deposit and Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez (2) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1500 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided as to each. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/20/21 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Arraignment set for 8/05/21 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. (Interpreter Juan Davila-Santiago). (CD# 7/9/2021 MSB 21-1:2:14-3:08). (Plaintiff Attorney Amy Brammell AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Sebastian Swain-Gil FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez, Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/9/21. (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/9/21. (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Bismark Julio Montoya-Lopez (1) $15,000 PS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/9/2021. (dxf)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jose Rogelio Montoya-Lopez (2) $15,000 PS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/9/2021. (dxf)
Related: [-]