Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Charles E Atchley, Jr
Referred: H Bruce Guyton
Case #: 3:21-cv-00285
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2021
Terminated:Sep 27, 2021
Defendant
Capt Turner
Defendant
Captain Cox
Defendant
Chief Bravo
Defendant
Chief Purvis
Defendant
Chief Stevens
Defendant
Corp Baker
Defendant
Corp Moneymaker
Defendant
Roger D Wilson Detention Facility Staff
Defendant
Sgt Pemberton
Defendant
Teresa Doe
Defendant
Vicky Doe
Plaintiff
Christopher L Chadwick

GPO Sep 27 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Judgment Order to follow. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 9/27/21. (c/m Christopher L Chadwick 527568 HARDEMAN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY P.O. Box 549 Whiteville, TN 38075 and custodian of inmate accounts) (ADA)
GPO Sep 27 2021
JUDGMENT ORDER, prisoner's pro se civil rights action, filed under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Because the Court CERTIFIED in the Memorandum and Order that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 9/27/21. (c/m) (ADA)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 27, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/27 9:37 AM
JUDGMENT ORDER, prisoner's pro se civil rights action, filed under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Because the Court CERTIFIED in the Memorandum and Order that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 9/27/21. (c/m) (ADA)
Related: [-]
8 8 7 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/27 9:35 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account is DIRECTED to submit the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth. Judgment Order to follow. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 9/27/21. (c/m Christopher L Chadwick 527568 HARDEMAN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY P.O. Box 549 Whiteville, TN 38075 and custodian of inmate accounts) (ADA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
7 7 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 09/23 1:26 PM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT statement by Plaintiff Christopher L Chadwick (ADA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
misc Public Docket Annotation Wed 08/25 7:44 AM
Mailed4 with forms to Christopher Chadwick 1727 E. Union Valley Road Seymour, TN 37865 (ADA)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/25 7:47 AM
Reset Show Cause Response re4 to 10/6/2021 . (ADA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/24 11:17 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, not deliverable as addressed. Mail sent to Christopher L Chadwick re4 Order to Show Cause (JBR)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/20 2:44 PM
MAIL addressed to Christopher Chadwick RETURNED as Undeliverable re3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (AYB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/11 9:42 AM
ORDER, Plaintiff has not paid the required $400.00 filing fee, nor has he submitted the proper documents to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary, updated documents. Signed by District Judge Charles E. Atchley, Jr. on 8/11/21. (c/m with forms)(ADA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
3 3 notice Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Mon 08/09 9:33 AM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (c/m to Christopher L Chadwick, KNOX COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY, 5001 MALONEYVILLE ROAD, KNOXVILLE, TN 37918) (ABF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 08/09 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Roger D Wilson Detention Facility Staff, filed by Christopher L Chadwick.(ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other attachments and envelope
1 1 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Mon 08/09 9:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher L Chadwick. (ABF)
Related: [-]