California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:21-cv-06117
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2021
Terminated:Nov 17, 2021
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:00 PM PDT
Defendant
Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By
Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Kelly Michelle Gorton
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Kenneth E. Payson
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cooper Moore
Represented By
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC
contact info
Sophia Marie Rios
Berger Montague PC
contact info
E. Michelle Drake
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Jennifer Rust Murray
Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
35 35 misc Transcript Wed 11/17 2:01 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10 21-2021 before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2022. (Pas, Debra)
Related: [-] 34 Transcript Order (s)34
utility Remark Wed 11/17 3:43 PM
Transferring case electronically to the Western District of Washington. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
34 34 misc Transcript Order Fri 10/22 6:05 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/21/2021 before Judge James Donato by Cooper Moore, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Drake, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
33 33 1 pgs minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Order on Motion to Transfer Case Thu 10/21 3:31 PM
Minute Entry and Order Transferring Case for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2021. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2021)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
32 32 20 pgs respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 10/07 9:08 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byRobinhood Financial LLC. (Nangia, Sanjay)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss
31 31 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 10/07 9:07 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byRobinhood Financial LLC. (Nangia, Sanjay)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION to Transfer Case
Thursday, September 30, 2021
30 30 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 09/30 5:15 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byCooper Moore. (Terrell, Beth)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION to Transfer Case
29 29 5 pgs oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 09/30 5:15 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re27 Opposition/Response to Motion,28 Declaration in Support filed byCooper Moore. Related [+] (Terrell, Beth)
Related: [-] 27 ,28
28 28 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 09/30 5:13 PM
Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of27 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCooper Moore. Related [+] (Terrell, Beth)
Related: [-] 27
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
27 27 22 pgs respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 09/30 5:11 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byCooper Moore. (Terrell, Beth)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, September 24, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 09/24 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sanjay Mohan Nangia (Nangia, Sanjay)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/24 8:30 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren B. Rainwater. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/24/2021 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/24 8:17 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth E Payson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/24 8:02 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to E. Michelle Drake. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
22 22 motion Transfer Case Thu 09/16 5:40 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021.(Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 22 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 09/16 5:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021.(Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 23, 2021
20 20 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 08/23 1:17 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/19 9:26 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2021.(mbcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 08/18 1:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 08/18 1:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Financial LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 08/18 1:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robinhood Financial LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc. for Robinhood Financial LLC. (Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/18 1:24 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16297216.) filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Rainwater, Lauren)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/18 1:18 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16297160.) filed by Robinhood Financial LLC. (Payson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/18 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Michelle Gorton (Gorton, Kelly)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/18 11:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cooper Moore.. (Rios, Sophia)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/18 11:46 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16296635.) filed by Cooper Moore.(Drake, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/17 9:43 AM
Order. Signed 8/17/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Jennifer Rust Murray.(klhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/16 4:08 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16289073.) filed by Cooper Moore. (Murray, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/16 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Terrell for Plaintiff Cooper Moore (Terrell, Beth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/13 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Moore. Robinhood Financial LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Proof of Service (Rios, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/10 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Robinhood Financial LLC. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 08/10 8:17 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 08/10 8:03 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/24/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 08/09 5:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Cooper Moore (Rios, Sophia)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/09 5:30 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rios, Sophia)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/09 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16266179.). Filed byCooper Moore.(Rios, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet