Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:21-ap-03051
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2021
Terminated:Jan 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C.
Represented By
Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
James Dondero
Represented By
Michael A. Rosenthal
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, January 27, 2022
27 27 court Notice of remand Thu 01/27 10:44 AM
Notice of remand (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Thu 01/27 11:12 AM
Adversary case 3:21-ap-3051 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
26 26 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 01/06 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order granting James Dondero's motion for remand adversary proceeding to State Court, Denying fee reimbursement request, and related rulings (related document4 ) Entered on 1/4/2022.
25 25 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 01/06 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Memorandum of opinion (RE: related document(s)4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero). Entered on 1/4/2022
24 24 misc Certificate of service Thu 01/06 8:12 PM
Certificate of service re: Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting James Dondero's Motion to Remand Adversary Proceeding to State Court, Denying Fee Reimbursement Request, and Related Rulings Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 23 Order granting James Dondero's motion for remand adversary proceeding to State Court, Denying fee reimbursement request, and related rulings (related document4 ) Entered on 1/4/2022.
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
23 23 order Remand Tue 01/04 3:28 PM
Order granting James Dondero's motion for remand adversary proceeding to State Court, Denying fee reimbursement request, and related rulings Related [+] Entered on 1/4/2022. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 4
22 22 22 pgs order Memorandum of opinion Tue 01/04 3:25 PM
Memorandum of opinion Related [+]. Entered on 1/4/2022 (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
Thursday, October 14, 2021
21 21 court Transcript Thu 10/14 1:28 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/12/2021 (62 pages) RE: Motion for Remand (#4); Status Conference Re: Notice of Removal. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 01/12/2022. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Rehling, kathyrehlingtranscripts@gmail.com, Telephone number 972-786-3063. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 01/12/2022.
Related: [-] 18 Hearing held on 10/12/2021. (RE: related document(s)4 Motion for remand, filed by Plaintiff James Dondero filed by Plaintiff James Dondero) (Appearances: C. Taylor and B. Assink for J. Dondero; B. Rawicki, M. Rosenthal, M. King for Alvarez & Marsal; B. McIlwaine and D Shulte for Farralon; J. Pomeranz for Debtor. Nonevidentiary hearing. Court took matter under advisement.), 19 Hearing held on 10/12/2021. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 21-03051 Complaint by James Dondero against Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C., Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). filed by Plaintiff James Dondero) (Appearances: C. Taylor and B. Assink for J. Dondero; B. Rawicki, M. Rosenthal, M. King for Alvarez & Marsal; B. McIlwaine and D Shulte for Farralon; J. Pomeranz for Debtor. Nonevidentiary hearing. Court took matter under advisement.)hling, Kathy
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
20 20 court Request for transcript Wed 10/13 3:56 PM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 10/12/2021. The requested turn-around time is hourly. (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
19 19 court Hearing held Tue 10/12 4:33 PM
Hearing held on 10/12/2021. Related [+] (Appearances: C. Taylor and B. Assink for J. Dondero; B. Rawicki, M. Rosenthal, M. King for Alvarez & Marsal; B. McIlwaine and D Shulte for Farralon; J. Pomeranz for Debtor. Nonevidentiary hearing. Court took matter under advisement.) (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-03051 Complaint by James Dondero against Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C., Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
18 18 court Hearing held Tue 10/12 4:32 PM
Hearing held on 10/12/2021. Related [+] (Appearances: C. Taylor and B. Assink for J. Dondero; B. Rawicki, M. Rosenthal, M. King for Alvarez & Marsal; B. McIlwaine and D Shulte for Farralon; J. Pomeranz for Debtor. Nonevidentiary hearing. Court took matter under advisement.) (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for remand, filed by Plaintiff James Dondero filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
17 17 misc Certificate of service Tue 10/12 11:15 AM
Certificate of service re: Response of Highland Capital Management, L.P. to James Dondero's Motion to Remand Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 14 Response opposed to (related document(s):4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero) filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Saturday, October 09, 2021
16 16 answer Reply Sat 10/09 4:21 PM
Reply to Related [+] filed by Plaintiff James Dondero. (Taylor, Clay)
Related: [-] 11 Objection filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC,14 Response filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Thursday, October 07, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of service Thu 10/07 8:13 PM
Certificate of service re: Response of Highland Capital Management, L.P. to James Dondero's Motion to Remand Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 14 Response opposed to (related document(s):4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero) filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Monday, October 04, 2021
14 14 answer Response Mon 10/04 12:01 PM
Response opposed to Related [+] filed by Debtor Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
13 13 notice Notice (generic) Mon 10/04 11:09 AM
Notice re Rule 7007.1 Disclosure filed by Defendant Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (generic) Wed 09/29 7:37 PM
Notice re Rule 7007.1 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC. (Rosenthal, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Objection Wed 09/29 7:29 PM
Objection to Related [+] and Response to Dondero's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC. (Rosenthal, Michael)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits
Sunday, September 26, 2021
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 09/26 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Marshall R. King for Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC (related document8 ) Entered on 9/24/2021. (Okafor, M.)
Friday, September 24, 2021
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 09/24 5:16 PM
Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Marshall R. King for Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC Related [+] Entered on 9/24/2021. (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, September 23, 2021
8 8 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 09/23 7:59 PM
Motion to appear pro hac vice for Marshall R. King. Fee Amount $100 filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC (Haitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 09/23 7:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric Thomas Haitz filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC. (Haitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 09/23 8:00 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice 21-03051 sgj) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number 29005295, amount $ 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#8
Monday, September 20, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of hearing Mon 09/20 1:14 PM
Amended Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. (Haitz, Eric)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
Thursday, September 09, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of hearing Thu 09/09 12:44 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Plaintiff James Dondero Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 10/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga for4 ,(Assink, Bryan)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
Att: 1 Webex Instructions
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
4 4 motion Remand Wed 09/08 3:59 PM
Motion for remand filed by Plaintiff James Dondero (Taylor, Clay)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of hearing Mon 08/16 1:39 PM
Notice of status conference filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 9/27/2021 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Dondero
2 2 6 pgs notice Notice (generic) Fri 08/13 12:18 PM
Notice of Status Conference; to be held on September 27, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. filed by Defendant Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C.. (Rosenthal, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/09 2:08 PM
Adversary case 21-03051 Complaint by James Dondero against Alvarez & Marsal CRF Management, LLC and Farallon Capital Management, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause). (Rosenthal, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet