Georgia Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00058
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 11, 2021 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
James D. Egan (2)
Defendant
William J. Siveter (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David H. Estes
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Savannah
contact info
Jonathan Alan Porter
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info
Karl Irving Knoche
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/11/2021 3:48 AM EDT
Monday, August 09, 2021
1 1 7 pgs INFORMATION as to William J. Siveter (1) count 1, James D. Egan (2) count 1. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs PENALTY CERTIFICATION by Government as to William J. Siveter, James D. Egan. (loh)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs MOTION for Leave of Absence as to USA for dates of : Aug 31-Sept 2, 2021; Sept 20-24, 2021; Sept 30-Oct 1, 2021; and Oct 26-29, 2021 by on behalf of USA. Responses due by 8/23/2021.(Porter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order