Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Case #: 3:21-cv-00460
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2021
Terminated:Mar 28, 2023
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Mar 02 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND ORDER regarding 1 Complaint filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the final decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security be AFFIRMED, and this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send this Magistrate Judges Report, Recommendation and Order to Plaintiff Tiffany Latres Stamper by regular and certified mail, return receipt requested at the address listed on PACER. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/2/2023. (JEG)
GPO Mar 28 2023
RULING AND ORDER Adopting 18 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the final decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security be and is hereby AFFIRMED as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/28/2023. (JEG) Modified on 3/28/2023 to edit title of document (JEG).

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 11, 2023
29 29 appeal USCA Mandate (Standard) Mon 12/11 9:30 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to23 Notice of Appeal filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. Action Taken at the Circuit: IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
28 28 appeal Return on Appeal Transmittal Letter Tue 06/20 1:19 PM
Return on Appeal Transmittal Letter. (LLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
appeal Notice: EROA Certified and Available to Counsel Wed 06/07 3:06 PM
NOTICE: The Record on Appeal has been Certified and Electronic Access to the Record is available through the Court of Appeals CM/ECF document filing system. Instructions for accessing the record can be found at[LINK:www.ca5.uscourts.gov/attorneys/attorney-forms/eroa_downloads] . The clerk of court will retain the responsibility of sending the record to the 5th Circuit upon their request. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/01 9:37 AM
ORDER granting24 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2023. (LLH)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 06/01 2:42 PM
USCA Case Number 23-30355 for23 Notice of Appeal filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
24 24 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/26 1:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
23 23 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 05/24 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of21 Judgment by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
21 21 order Judgment Tue 03/28 3:56 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-captioned action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/28/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Ruling Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 03/28 3:51 PM
RULING AND ORDER Adopting18 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the final decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security be and is hereby AFFIRMED as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/28/2023. (JEG) Modified on 3/28/2023 to edit title of document (JEG)
Related: [-]
order Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04 Tue 03/28 3:57 PM
GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
19 19 misc Return on Certified Mail Thu 03/16 9:59 AM
Return on Certified Mail re18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
18 18 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 03/02 3:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND ORDER regarding1 Complaint filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the final decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security be AFFIRMED, and this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send this Magistrate Judges Report, Recommendation and Order to Plaintiff Tiffany Latres Stamper by regular and certified mail, return receipt requested at the address listed on PACER. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/2/2023. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
17 17 respoth Memorandum in Opposition (Not to be Used with a Motion) Mon 04/11 8:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to15 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/11 8:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
15 15 respoth Memorandum in Support (Not to be Used with a Motion) Fri 02/11 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of1 Appeal/Complaint and Change of Address filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Transcript of Administrative Record (S.S. Case) Fri 01/28 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Kilolo Kijakazi(Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Attachment,
Att: 4 Attachment,
Att: 5 Attachment,
Att: 6 Attachment
Friday, December 17, 2021
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/17 10:25 AM
ORDER granting11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Administrative Record for good cause shown. Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi shall file the administrative record in this matter by no later than January 28, 2022. The remaining scheduling deadlines in this Court's5 Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 12/16 12:09 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Document. R. Doc. 9 is hereby removed from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
utility Motion(s) Referred Wed 12/15 11:35 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:10 MOTION to Withdraw Incorrectly filed document9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Administrative Record ,11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file the Administrative Record,9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Administrative Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
11 11 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/14 7:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file the Administrative Record by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Withdraw Tue 12/14 7:20 PM
MOTION to Withdraw9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Administrative Record by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/14 4:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File the Administrative Record by Kilolo Kijakazi.(Jack, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/28 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Attorney General served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (US Marshal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/17 8:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. USAO served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (US Marshal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/14 12:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (US Marshal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
5 5 order Social Security Scheduling Order Mon 08/16 3:31 PM
ORDER: This action for judicial review of the administrative decision shall proceed in accordance with the schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/16/2021. (LLH)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 08/16 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (NOTICE: Summons issued to USM for service.) (LLH)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/16 1:57 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Plaintiff(s) will be required to provide to the United States Marshal a completed U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each defendant to be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/16/2021. (LLH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285 Form
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
utility Motion(s) Referred Wed 08/11 4:11 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/11 11:30 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tiffany Latres' Stamper. (BLR) Modified on 8/11/2021 to edit the file date (NLT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Wed 08/11 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Tiffany Latres' Stamper.(NLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Cover Letter,
Att: 4 Envelope