Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00030
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Aug 12, 2021 3:26 AM EDT
Defendant
SEAN HVIZDZAK (2)
Defendant
SHANE HVIZDZAK (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christian A. Trabold
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM ORDER as to SEAN HVIZDZAK denying 50 Defendant's Motion for a Bill of Particulars. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/1/22. (kw)
GPO Jan 17 2023
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF COURT as to SHANE HVIZDZAK (1) denying 94 Defendant's Motion to Unfreeze Limited Assets to Pay for Attorney's Fees and further ordering that replacement counsel shall be appointed forthwith to represent Defendant pursuant to the provisions of the Criminal Justice Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3006A. See Memorandum and Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/17/23. (kw)
GPO Sep 11 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to SHANE HVIZDZAK indicating that 130 Defendant's Motion to Suppress His June 17, 2020 Statement to Law Enforcement is denied in all respects. See Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/11/24. (kw)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 5:19 AM EDT
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
1 1 25 pgs INDICTMENT as to SHANE HVIZDZAK (1) count(s) 1, 2-24, 29-37, 39-40, 49-53, 56-65, SEAN HVIZDZAK (2) count(s) 1, 5-7, 9-12, 22-23, 25-32, 38, 41-48, 54-55, 58-59. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions SHANE,
Att: 2 1 pgs Arraignment Plea SHANE,
Att: 3 2 pgs Criminal Case Info Sheet SHANE,
Att: 4 1 pgs Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions SEAN,
Att: 5 1 pgs Arraignment Plea SEAN,
Att: 6 2 pgs Criminal Case Info Sheet SEAN
2 2 6 pgs Indictment MEMORANDUM as to SHANE HVIZDZAK, SEAN HVIZDZAK (cel)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs REQUEST FOR SUMMONS as to SHANE HVIZDZAK to appear for arraignment. Defendant to Post unsecured bond in the amount of $10,000.00. Arraignment set for 8/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (cel)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *SHANE HVIZDZAK*. Arraignment set for 8/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (cel)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs REQUEST FOR SUMMONS as to SEAN HVIZDZAK to appear for arraignment. Defendant to Post Unsecured bond in the amount of $10,000.00. Arraignment set for 8/24/2021 at 09:15 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (cel)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *SEAN HVIZDZAK*. Arraignment set for 8/24/2021 at 09:15 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. (cel)
Related: [-]