Harris v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02533 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 06, 2022 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Harris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Harris Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02533-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/12 2:49 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Harris v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2533-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Virginia (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10008155.), filed by Benjamin Harris. Service due by 11/8/2021(sshe, ) |