New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric N Vitaliano
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:21-cv-04568
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 09, 2022 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
Kenneth Petty
Represented By
Steven David Isser
Law Offices Of Steven D. Isser
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Hough
Represented By
Tyrone Anthony Blackburn
T. A. Blackburn Law, Pllc.
contact info
Steven N. Gordon
Tsyngauz & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Tara Elizabeth Faenza
Mcgivney, Kluger, Clark & Intoccia, PC
contact info
Michael Joseph Snizek
Mcgivney Kluger Clark & Intoccia, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Onika Tanya Maraj
Terminated: 01/19/2022
Represented By
Emily C. Finestone
Judd Burstein, P.C.
contact info
Judd Burstein
Judd Burstein, PC
contact info

GPO Oct 10 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 97 Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement filed by Jennifer Hough. For the reasons discussed, this Court respectfully recommends denying plaintiff's motion to add a claim for attempted rape, but grants her motion to add factual allegations and exhibits to the existing claims. Objections to R&R due by 10/24/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 10/10/2023. (JP)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
order Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/08 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held on 4/8/2025 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearances by Tyrone Anthony Blackburn for plaintiff; Steven David Isser for defendant Petty. Argument heard and rulings made on the record denying110 plaintiff's motion to compel. By 4/22/2025 , defendant Petty (or a third-party on his behalf) shall produce an affidavit identifying the income defendant has received, and, if available, the source of the payments, for the period 2020 to present. Status conference scheduled for 6/9/2025 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11-D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. (FTR 2:36-2:50). (JDP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order(Other) Fri 04/04 3:43 PM
ORDER: Granting Dkt.113 letter extending the deadline for defendant's handwriting expert disclosure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/4/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
113 113 misc Letter Thu 04/03 11:46 AM
Letter informing the Court of agreement to change expert disclosure by Kenneth Petty (Isser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
112 112 respoth Reply in Support Tue 04/01 2:09 PM
REPLY in Support re110 First MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Jennifer Hough, by and through her undersigned counsel, respectfully moves this Court for an order compelling Defendant Kenneth Petty to produce: 1. Copies of his state and federal tax returns from 2017 to present; a filed by Jennifer Hough. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
Related: [-]