New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Peggy Kuo
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:21-cv-04574
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2021
Terminated:Jan 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 09, 2022 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc.
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Green Ready Mixx, LLC
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Taimur Alamgir
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gurdial Singh
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Taimur Alamgir
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Talwinder Singh Parmar
Represented By
Keith J. Gutstein
Kaufman, Dolowich, Voluck & Gonzo, LLP
contact info
Taimur Alamgir
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sunny Builders NY Corp.
Plaintiff
Fabio Cortes Bolivar
Represented By
Khalil Patrick Huey
Csm Legal P.C.
contact info
Michael A. Faillace
Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Catalina Sojo
Csm Legal P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 19, 2023
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/19 6:22 PM
ORDER: The Court construes the41 status report to be a notice of voluntary dismissal against defendant G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/19/2023. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
41 41 misc Status Report Mon 01/16 11:37 AM
STATUS REPORT Amended Filing by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually) (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
40 40 misc Status Report Fri 01/13 5:07 PM
STATUS REPORT by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually) (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 01/10 2:01 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by January 13, 2023 informing the Court how they intend to proceed with defendant G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/10/2023. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
39 39 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Mon 01/09 7:46 PM
ORDER: The stipulation of dismissal filed at37 is so-ordered. This action is hereby dismissed and discontinued in its entirety, with prejudice, as to Defendants Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp., Green Ready Mixx, LLC and Gurdial Singh. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/9/2023. (RO)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 08, 2023
38 38 misc Letter Sun 01/08 8:53 PM
Letter to Magistrate Judge Kuo Requesting that ECF No. 37 be So Ordered by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/06 5:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/06 4:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc., Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 12/06 9:07 AM
ORDER: Having reviewed the proposed Settlement Agreement and Wage and Hour Release [34-1] and the related submissions, I find, pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), that the settlement amount and payment plan are fair and reasonable and that the release is appropriately limited to wage and hour claims. See Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F. Supp. 2d 332, 335-36 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). I also find that the fees and costs are reasonable. Attorneys' fees exclusive of costs represent 31.62% of the total settlement amount, and the reasonable costs of $1544 are supported by appropriate documentation. Accordingly, the Motion for Settlement is granted and the Settlement Agreement is approved. Although a Stipulation of Dismissal is attached [34-1], it is not signed. The parties are directed to file a signed Stipulation of Dismissal no later than January 6, 2023 . The Court declines to retain jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/6/2022.(LG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
35 35 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/29 2:32 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (IH)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Settlement Agreement Mon 11/28 5:32 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually) (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Damages Chart,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Attorneys Fees and Costs Report
33 33 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/28 10:50 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually). (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Tue 11/29 2:31 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. (IH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/21 7:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cheeks Motion and Settlement Agreement by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 11/21 10:24 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc ., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) is extended to November 28, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/21/2022. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/07 10:18 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc ., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) is extended to November 21, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/7/2022. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 11/04 4:56 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually). (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 10/17 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Motion for Approval of the Settlement by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/17 5:07 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) is extended to November 7, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/17/2022. (RO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 09/21 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually) (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 09/21 5:27 PM
ORDER: In light of the Notice of Settlement29 informing the Court the parties have reached a settlement in principle, the parties are directed to file a motion for settlement approval pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015) by October 21, 2022. The motion must include 1) the proposed settlement agreement; 2) a fairness letter explaining how the settlement agreement, including any attorneys' fees in the agreement, comports with caselaw; and 3) time records, if attorneys' fees are included in the agreement. For guidance, the parties are directed to Lopez v. Nights of Cabiria , 96 F.Supp.3d 170 (S.D.N.Y. 2015); Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc. , 900 F.Supp.2d 332 (S.D.N.Y. 2012); and Flores v. Food Express Rego Park, Inc. , No. 15-CV-1410 (KAM) (SMG), 2016 WL 386042 (E.D.N.Y. Feb. 1, 2016). The parties are reminded that if all parties consent, a United States magistrate judge may conduct all proceedings in this civil action including trial. The consent form is available at the following link [LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] and may be filed only if all parties consent and sign it. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73 and Local Rule 73.1. The parties may withhold their consent without adverse substantive consequences. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/21/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
adr Selection of Mediator Tue 07/19 1:55 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Giulio Zanolla selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on August 22, 2022. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms.The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
28 28 misc Letter Wed 06/22 2:09 PM
Letter Re: Referral to Mediation by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/22 2:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Sunny Builders NY Corp. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mediation Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 06/22 2:50 PM
ORDER: The case is referred to the EDNY ADR Program for court-annexed mediation to be completed by September 22, 2022. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by September 26, 2022 regarding the result of mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/22/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 06/22 2:54 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 06/20 7:52 PM
ORDER: Defendants must file any response to the26 status report no later than June 22, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/20/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 06/17 5:09 PM
STATUS REPORT by Ramsha Ansari by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 05/16 9:59 AM
STATUS REPORT by Ramsha Ansari by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (Sojo, Catalina) Modified on 5/16/2022 to add motion for extension of time to file (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 05/16 4:26 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are directed to file a further joint status report regarding settlement efforts by June 16, 2022 . If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/16/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 05/09 8:36 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report regarding settlement efforts is extended to May 16, 2022. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/9/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 07, 2022
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Sat 05/07 2:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Update Regarding Settlement Discussions/Possibility of Mediation by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/25 3:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Status Update Regarding Settlement by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 04/25 4:16 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report regarding settlement efforts is extended to May 9, 2022 . If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/25/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/11 5:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/06 12:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Khalil Patrick Huey by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). (Huey, Khalil)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/06 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ramsha Ansari on behalf of Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (aty to be noticed) (Ansari, Ramsha)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/06 12:27 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Khalil Patrick Huey terminated. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/6/2022. (Kuntz, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/05 6:26 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, and Talwinder Singh Parmar to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to April 11, 2022. The 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File is granted. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report regarding settlement efforts is extended to April 25, 2022 . If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/5/2022. (Gus, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/05 11:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar. (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/08 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Gutstein on behalf of G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc., Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar (aty to be noticed) (Gutstein, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 02/07 10:22 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, and Talwinder Singh Parmar to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to April 4, 2022. The 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File is granted. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report regarding settlement efforts is extended to April 18, 2022 . If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/7/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 06, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation Sun 02/06 12:31 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time To Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, File Joint Status Report by Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 02/06 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taimur Alamgir on behalf of Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar (aty to be noticed) (Alamgir, Taimur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/13 11:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). Talwinder Singh Parmar served on 1/8/2022, answer due 1/29/2022. (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/30 5:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). Green Ready Mixx, LLC served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/23 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). Sunny Builders NY Corp. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/23 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc. served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 11/08 9:19 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael A. Faillace terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/8/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 06, 2021
9 9 motion Withdraw as Attorney Sat 11/06 12:19 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/04 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catalina Sojo on behalf of Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (aty to be noticed) (Sojo, Catalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 10/21 12:33 PM
Summons Issued as to G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc., Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp.. (Herrera, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/17 11:26 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rider to Request for Summons
Monday, August 16, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/16 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Khalil Patrick Huey on behalf of Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated) (aty to be noticed) (Huey, Khalil)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 08/13 3:07 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 08/13 3:07 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/13 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against G & J Ready Mix & Masonry Supply, Inc., Green Ready Mixx, LLC, Gurdial Singh, Talwinder Singh Parmar, Sunny Builders NY Corp. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14750323 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Fabio Cortes Bolivar(individually), Fabio Cortes Bolivar(and on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/13 3:04 PM
Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 08/13 3:05 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider with the names and addresses of all defendants included, attached to a single summons., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 08/13 5:12 PM
ORDER IN FLSA CASE REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION SCHEDULE: The parties are ordered to engage in discovery as outlined in the attached Order, and to engage in early settlement discussions. A joint status report regarding settlement efforts must be filed by February 14, 2022. If the parties are unable to settle on their own, the case will be referred to EDNY Court-Annexed Mediation for formal mediation. The parties may move to waive these requirements and permit the parties to proceed by way of a Proposed Discovery Plan only for good cause, by filing a joint letter request on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/13/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan). (Main Document replaced on 8/13/2021) (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
Related: [-]