Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: Janie S Mayeron
Case #: 0:14-cv-03016
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause47:153 Telecommunications Act of 1996
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2014
Terminated:Jun 16, 2015
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 10:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Stoyanov & Hymas
Represented By
M Gregory Simpson
Meagher & Geer, Pllp
contact info
Casey D Marshall
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Christian A Brandt
Hkm Law Group
contact info
Kelly S Hadac
Hkm Law Group
contact info
Jennifer M Zwilling
Meagher & Geer, Pllp
contact info
Michael A Klutho
Bassford Remele, PA
contact info
Julia J Nierengarten
Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald White
Represented By
Christopher P Martineau
Johnston-Martineau, Pllp
contact info
Christopher A Johnston
Johnston Martineau Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
42 42 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/16 3:44 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/16/15. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/15 4:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Donald White. Jointly Signed by Stoyanov & Hymas d/b/a 411 Locals. (Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2015
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/20 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Zwilling on behalf of Stoyanov & Hymas. (Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/20 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Zwilling on behalf of Stoyanov & Hymas. (Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
38 38 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Fri 04/17 7:56 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Stoyanov & Hymas. (Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
37 37 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/16 3:24 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2015. Discovery due by 1/1/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 1/15/2016. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 04/16/2015. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
36 36 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/16 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2015. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2015
35 35 notice Notice to Attorney Mon 03/30 2:19 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorney: Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 4/14/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/27 3:37 PM
NOTICE by Stoyanov & Hymas Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Brandt, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
33 33 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 03/18 8:55 AM
AMENDED JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Donald White. Jointly Signed by Stoyanov & Hymas.(Martineau, Christopher) Modified on 3/18/2015 (las)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
32 32 notice Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Tue 03/17 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
31 31 order Order Wed 03/11 4:09 PM
SECOND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2015 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 03/11/2015.(lmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Friday, February 27, 2015
30 30 order Order Mon 03/02 8:02 AM
ORDER that 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration [Docket No.26 ] is GRANTED. 2. Defendant's Motion to Stay [Docket No.9 ] is DENIED for the reasons set forth in the memorandum below. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 02/27/2015. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
29 29 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/07 11:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stoyanov & Hymas re28 Brief Certificate of Service on Proposed Order re Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (see Docket 27 Order to file objections) (Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
28 28 respm Brief Tue 01/06 5:18 PM
BRIEF Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (see Dkt 27 Order to file objections) .(Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Wednesday, December 24, 2014
27 27 order Order Wed 12/24 2:01 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1. Plaintiff's request for permission to file a motion for reconsideration [Docket No.24 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's Objections to the December 9, 2014, filed on December 19, 2014 [Docket No.26 shall be treated as Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. 3. On or before January 6, 2015, defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant's response shall not exceed 3500 words. 4. In light of this Court's grant of plaintiff's request for permission to file a motion for reconsideration of the Order dated December 9, 2014, granting defendant's Motion to Stay, plaintiff's objection [Docket No.26 is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/24/2014. (TSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 19, 2014
26 26 motion Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge Fri 12/19 2:51 PM
OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION re23 Order on Motion to Stay(Martineau, Christopher) Modified text on 12/29/2014 (TSS).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Friday, December 12, 2014
25 25 misc Letter Response to Letter Fri 12/12 2:05 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE In Response re24 Letter to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider. (Zwilling, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/15/2014 (lmb).
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 11, 2014
24 24 misc Letter to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider Thu 12/11 10:59 AM
LETTER to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider . (Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 09, 2014
23 23 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 12/09 3:35 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 12/09/2014. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 03, 2014
22 22 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 12/03 4:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Donald White.(Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 01, 2014
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Mon 12/01 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Stoyanov & Hymas. (Zwilling, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 29, 2014
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2014. Defendant's Motion to Stay (Docket No.9 )-TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. ORDER TO BE ISSUED. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
19 19 Second Declaration of Casey D. Marshall in Support of18 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Stoyanov & Hymas.(Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) H, I, J
18 18 Reply to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Stay filed by Stoyanov & Hymas.(Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Wednesday, October 01, 2014
17 17 DECLARATION of Christopher P. Martineau in Opposition to16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Donald White.(Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-G
16 16 24 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 MOTION to Stay filed by Donald White.(Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
15 15 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2014 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 10/01/2014.(lmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Thursday, September 25, 2014
14 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Stoyanov & Hymas re9 MOTION to Stay (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re9 Motion to Stay filed by Stoyanov & Hymas. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 Declaration of Casey D. Marshall in Support of10 Notice of Hearing on Motion,11 Memorandum in Support of Motion,9 MOTION to Stay filed by Stoyanov & Hymas.(Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-G
11 11 13 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Stay filed by Stoyanov & Hymas.(Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION9 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Stay by Stoyanov & Hymas. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Stoyanov & Hymas. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Stoyanov & Hymas. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 29, 2014
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald White. Stoyanov & Hymas served on 8/4/2014, answer due 9/25/2014. (Martineau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
5 5 ORDER re4 Stipulation: Defendant is granted an extension in which to respond to the above-captioned Complaint to and including September 25, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 08/27/2014. (lmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to Respond Between the Parties by Stoyanov & Hymas. Jointly Signed by Donald White. (Klutho, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 28, 2014
3 3 Summons Issued as to Stoyanov & Hymas. (lmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Please use case number 14-cv-3016 (MJD/JSM). (lmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Stoyanov & Hymas. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 0864-4071676.) Filed by Donald White. Filer requests summons issued.. (Martineau, Christopher) Modified text on 7/28/2014 (lmb). Modified text on 7/30/2014 (MGV).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet