Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:21-cv-03637
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2021
Terminated:Aug 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 12, 2022 4:45 AM EST
Defendant
CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC
Represented By
ELIZABETH F. LORELL
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRITTANY PEPPELMAN
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER A. MACEY, JR.
Bell & Bell LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC
Terminated: 11/29/2021
Represented By
MAUREEN P. FITZGERALD
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 18, 2023
34 34 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 08/18 3:15 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/17/23. 8/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 08/18 3:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. Video Settlement Conference held on 8/17/23. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 07/20 9:47 AM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 8/17/23 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 7/20/23. 7/20/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 06/15 10:45 AM
ORDER THAT ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/22/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 2/22/24. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/25/24 AT 10:00 A.M. BY REMOTE VIDEO; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 6/15/23. 6/15/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Thu 06/15 9:01 AM
Proposed Case Management Plan by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC.(Meehan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 08, 2023
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 06/08 11:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Motion Hearing held on 6/8/23 re18 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Quash Thu 06/08 10:50 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 6/8/23.6/8/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/30 2:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC. (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
26 26 7 pgs respm Memorandum Fri 05/26 11:00 PM
Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN.(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 04/05 2:34 PM
0RDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/5/23. 4/5/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
24 24 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/23 11:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Status Conference held on 3/22/23. (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/23 8:27 AM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SHALL BE HELD ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER SHALL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 15-B ON 6/8/23 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/22/23. 3/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Letter Wed 03/22 12:44 PM
Letter dated March 22, 2023 by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC. (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/02 2:51 PM
ORDER THAT A FOLLOW-UP CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT WILL BE HELD BY VIDEO ON 3/22/23 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/2/23. 3/2/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/24 1:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC.(LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 13, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 02/13 10:45 AM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT WILL BE HELD ON 3/2/23 AT 1:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/13/23. 2/13/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
18 18 motion Quash Fri 02/10 10:58 PM
MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Certificate of Counsel.(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 14, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/14 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Wesley Meehan on behalf of CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC (Meehan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report Of Mon 02/14 3:45 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting Amended by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC. (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Mon 11/29 11:10 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/29/21. 11/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11/29 9:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC. (FITZGERALD, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
13 13 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 10/26 8:51 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC.(FITZGERALD, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 10/25 5:09 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC.(LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/25 5:04 PM
CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC.(LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/25 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC.(FITZGERALD, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 10/19 2:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial/ RULE 16 Conference held on 10/19/21. (JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
8 8 misc Report Of Fri 10/15 12:17 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC. (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/08 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MAUREEN P. FITZGERALD on behalf of MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FITZGERALD, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
6 6 misc Letter Thu 09/30 1:36 PM
Letter dated 09/30/2021 by CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC. (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/29 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH F. LORELL on behalf of CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC (LORELL, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
misc Remark Wed 09/08 8:33 AM
DOC. NO. 4 MAILED TO UNREPS (ems)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 09/07 1:19 PM
ORDER THAT A FED.R.CIV. P.16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 10/19/21 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 9/7/21. 9/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(JL )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/31 11:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN. MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/31 11:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN. CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC waiver sent on 8/17/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 08/16 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC, MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15338357.), filed by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN.(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form
misc Jury Demand Mon 08/16 2:58 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRITTANY PEPPELMAN. (fb)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 08/16 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to CHRISTIAN HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, LLC, MORVENT AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/16/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]