Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:21-cv-61716
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2021
Terminated:May 26, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Feb 12, 2022 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
LVNV Funding, LLC
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Lauren Marshall Burnette
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Mediator
Steven R Jaffe
Plaintiff
Zubic Drago
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Loan Lawyers, LLC 3201 Griffin Road Suite 100 Fort Lauderdale
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312
Represented By
Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Consumer Justice Center PA
contact info
Matthew David Bavaro
Loan Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, June 27, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 06/27 10:06 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
30 30 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 05/26 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
29 29 adr Mediation Report Wed 05/25 2:30 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Steve Jaffe. Disposition: Settled in full.(Jaffe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
28 28 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/16 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Marshall Burnette on behalf of Mandarich Law Group LLP. Attorney Lauren Marshall Burnette added to party Mandarich Law Group LLP(pty:dft). (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/06 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Zubic Drago PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
26 26 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/02 12:43 PM
ORDER Consolidating Cases. Case consolidated with the case Zubic Drago v. Mandarich Law Group LLP, Case No. 22-60493 CIV-SMITH (S.D. Fla.). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
25 25 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 04/29 2:49 PM
ORDER granting24 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases; Parties Joint Amended Proposed Trial Order due 5/6/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
24 24 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 04/20 4:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LVNV Funding, LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2022(Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Tue 03/29 10:27 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 5/25/2022 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
22 22 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Mon 03/28 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Re-Notice of Mediation Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/25/2022 at 10:00 a.m.. (Jaffe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 12/03 10:49 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 3/31/2022 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
20 20 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 12/02 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Notice of Mediation Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/31/2022 at 2:00 p.m.. (Jaffe, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
19 19 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 11/30 9:57 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/02 9:16 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/02 8:52 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zubic Drago (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 11/01 12:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/20/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/01 12:45 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 1/2/2023 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 12/27/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2022., Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2022., Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2022., Mediation Deadline 6/20/2022., In Limine Motions due by 11/1/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2022., Motions due by 7/1/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/1/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 11/01 11:47 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Zubic Drago (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/01 11:47 AM
Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Zubic Drago (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/27 11:30 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Show Cause Response due by 11/2/2021). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
11 11 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Wed 10/06 9:42 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Zubic Drago (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
10 10 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 09/23 4:56 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/15/202. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/07 4:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/07 4:14 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by LVNV Funding, LLC. Attorney Lauren Marshall Burnette added to party LVNV Funding, LLC(pty:dft). (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Tue 08/17 11:43 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas Lyons. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14934096 by Zubic Drago. Responses due by 8/31/2021(Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/17 10:39 AM
NOTICE by Zubic Drago re1 Complaint (Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint
4 4 misc Bar Letter Tue 08/17 9:30 AM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Thomas J. Lyons, Jr., mailing date August 17, 2021, (pt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/17 8:27 AM
Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (scn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/17 2:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas J Lyons Jr, Esq. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/17/2021. (zgs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/16 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against LVNV Funding, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14932187, filed by Zubic Drago.(Bavaro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 08/17 8:25 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
Related: [-]