Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-14286

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:21-ap-01346
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Feb 20, 2025 1:26 PM EST
Counter-Claimant
BrainBuilders, LLC
945 River Ave
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
Vafa Sarmasti
Sarmasti PLLC
contact info
Counter-Defendant
QualCare, Inc.
30 Knightsbridge Road
Piscataway, NJ 08854
Represented By
Eric Evans Wohlforth, Jr.
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
BrainBuilders, LLC
945 River Ave
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
Vafa Sarmasti
Sarmasti PLLC
contact info
Cross-Claimant
Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
3131 Princeton Pike Bldg. 5, Suite 110
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648
Represented By
Donald W Clarke
Genova Burns LLC
contact info
Defendant
Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
3131 Princeton Pike Bldg. 5, Suite 110
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648
Represented By
Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
contact info
Donald W Clarke
Genova Burns LLC
contact info
Joseph Andrew Dickson
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Defendant
BrainBuilders, LLC
945 River Ave
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
BrainBuilders, LLC
contact info
Vafa Sarmasti
Sarmasti PLLC
contact info
Joseph Andrew Dickson
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Plaintiff
QualCare, Inc.
30 Knightsbridge Road
Piscataway, NJ 08854
Represented By
Eric Evans Wohlforth, Jr.
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Brett S. Theisen
Gibbons PC
contact info
Debra A. Clifford
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Brett Steven Theisen
Gibbons PC
contact info
Joseph Andrew Dickson
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Unknown Role Type
Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Agostino Angelo Zammiello
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown Role Type
Brian W. Hofmeister, Independent Receiver
Represented By
Sari Blair Placona
Mcmanimon Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/13 12:39 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/13/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-] 106 Motion For Summary Judgment RE: Claim Dispute in favor of Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust and against BrainBuilders, Inc.. Filed by Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust.Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Application in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Debtor's Cross Claim to Expunge the Brainbuilders Proof of Claim #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Exhibit C #5 Exhibit D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Proposed Order Expunging Brainbuilders' Proof of Claim) Filed by Cross-Claimant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust, Defendant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/13 12:39 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/13/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-] 84 Motion to Compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery Filed by Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust.Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Application in support of debtor's motion to compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary C #5 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Exhibit G #9 Exhibit H #10 Exhibit I #11 Exhibit J #12 Exhibit K #13 Exhibit L #14 Exhibit M #15 Exhibit N #16 Proposed Order) Filed by Cross-Claimant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust, Defendant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/13 12:39 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/13/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-] 84 Motion to Compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery Filed by Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust.Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Application in support of debtor's motion to compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary C #5 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Exhibit G #9 Exhibit H #10 Exhibit I #11 Exhibit J #12 Exhibit K #13 Exhibit L #14 Exhibit M #15 Exhibit N #16 Proposed Order) Filed by Cross-Claimant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust, Defendant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 05/13 12:40 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/13/2025. Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-] 84 Motion to Compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery Filed by Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust.Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Application in support of debtor's motion to compel Brainbuilder's compliance with discovery #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary C #5 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary D #6 Exhibit E #7 Exhibit F #8 Exhibit G #9 Exhibit H #10 Exhibit I #11 Exhibit J #12 Exhibit K #13 Exhibit L #14 Exhibit M #15 Exhibit N #16 Proposed Order) Filed by Cross-Claimant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust, Defendant Affiliated Physicians and Employers Master Trust