Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:21-cv-00810
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2021
Terminated:Jan 25, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 13, 2022 4:09 AM CST
Defendant
Michael Bassham
Defendant
Department of the Air Force
Defendant
Jonathon Fleeman
Defendant
Jason Puder
Plaintiff
Malik Shakur
1100 NE 16th
Oklahoma City, OK 73117


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
7 7 respm Response to Non - Motion Tue 02/08 4:46 PM
RESPONSE re6 Judgment,5 Order filed by Malik Shakur.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Supporting Documents
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
6 6 order Judgment Tue 01/25 10:13 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in accordance with the Order entered herein this 25th day of January, 2022, this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/25/22. (md)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 01/25 10:11 AM
ORDER the Court DISMISSES WITHOUTPREJUDICE Plaintiffs action against Defendants. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/25/22. (md)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
4 4 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 01/21 5:28 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Malik Shakur. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/05 3:40 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff is directed to show cause no later than January 219, 3033, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service of process within ninety days. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/5/22. (md)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
2 2 misc Receipt Tue 08/17 7:06 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Malik Shakur in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500086775 regarding1 Complaint (kmt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/17 7:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Bassham, Department of the Air Force, Jonathon Fleeman, Jason Puder filed by Malik Shakur.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet