Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-00326
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2019
Terminated:Aug 16, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Aug 19, 2021 2:16 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Benjamin Schrader
U.S. Attorney'S Office (nashville Office)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jonathan Serrano (1)
Terminated: 08/16/2021
Represented By
Sumter L. Camp, Jr.
Federal Public Defender'S Office (mdtn)
contact info
David L. Cooper
Law Office Of David L. Cooper, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 16 2021
JUDGMENT on sentencing held 8/13/2021 as to Jonathan Serrano: Plea of guilty to count 1 of the indictment. Imprisonment of 60 months. Remanded to custody. Three years supervised release, with conditions. $100 special assessment. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/16/2021. (vh)

Docket last updated: 08/19/2021 2:52 AM CDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment, Supporting Paperwork, and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Jonathan Serrano. (jb)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Govt's Motion to Seal Indictment, Supporting Paperwork, and Arrest Warrant as to Jonathan Serrano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/18/19. (jb)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT filed as to Jonathan Serrano. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (jb)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED DOCUMENT: Indictment with grand jury foreperson signature. Document sealed pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Criminal Case Files. THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT FOR PUBLIC DISCLOSURE. (jb)
Related: [-]
5 5 Warrant Issued as to Jonathan Serrano. (as)
Related: [-]