SUNNY et al v. BIDEN, JR. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-06947 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 5:16 AM EST |
Defendant
JULIE M. STUFFT
|
|
Defendant
JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
|
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
|
|
Plaintiff
GEORGE MATHEW
|
|
Plaintiff
SAJIDULLAH MALIK
|
|
Plaintiff
MOHAMMAD MIRZAEI
|
|
Plaintiff
OMAIMA SALAH MUNAWAR MOHAMED
|
|
Plaintiff
URMILA NEUPANE
|
|
Plaintiff
MUNA DEVI PANDEY
|
|
Plaintiff
RASMITA PANDEY
|
|
Plaintiff
DHRUBA PANTA
|
|
Plaintiff
SAROJ POUDEL
|
|
Plaintiff
CHARITH ISURANGA FERNAN RANMUTHUGE
|
|
Plaintiff
THARUSHI KUSHANI RANMUTHUGE
|
|
Plaintiff
BHIMESH BABU RIJAL
|
|
Plaintiff
ARZO SADAAT
|
|
Plaintiff
AINGARAN SATCHITHANANTHAM
|
|
Plaintiff
UZMA SEDIQI
|
|
Plaintiff
JAVED SHABBIR
|
|
Plaintiff
KHUSHBU DIVYESHKUMAR SH SHAH
|
|
Plaintiff
RAVI BIMAL ROY SHAH
|
|
Plaintiff
HASIB AHMAD SHERZAI
|
|
Plaintiff
ABHINAV SINGH
|
|
Plaintiff
BISHAKHA SINGH
|
|
Plaintiff
NIKHILA SUNNY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HASHINI CHATHURYA JAYASEKARA
|
|
Plaintiff
BIBHISHIKA ADHIKARI
|
|
Plaintiff
DIPTI ADHIKARI
|
|
Plaintiff
RUAA ALI SAEED AHMED
|
|
Plaintiff
SUBATHARSHANA AINGARAN
|
|
Plaintiff
AS
|
|
Plaintiff
SANJIP BASNET
|
|
Plaintiff
ANUP BHANDARI
|
|
Plaintiff
ASHISH CHALISE
|
|
Plaintiff
DILSHAN GAMARALALAGE
|
|
Plaintiff
BIJAY GAUDEL
|
|
Plaintiff
NAJIBA HAIDARI
|
|
Plaintiff
JAYAN CHAMIKARA MAPALAGAMA
|
|
Plaintiff
PASKY KABONGO KALAMBAYI
|
|
Plaintiff
BEATRICE MUSAU KAPIA
|
|
Plaintiff
NARMAYA KAWAR
|
|
Plaintiff
PUJAN KHADKA
|
|
Plaintiff
MOHAMED ELMAMON KHALD H KHOJALI
|
|
Plaintiff
SACHINI MALEESHA DE SIL LINDAMULAGE
|
|
Plaintiff
DHAN BAHADUR SINJALI MAGAR
|
|
Plaintiff
TEK KUMARI MAHATARA
|
|
Plaintiff
SAJIDA MALIK
|
|
Plaintiff
ALI OMER IESA ABDELRAHMEN
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 10/25/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on January 14, 2021) (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 08/26 9:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 08/26 9:12 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
Thu 08/19 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rafael Urena to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/24/2021. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 08/19 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Rafael Urena. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |