California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01473
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 3:47 AM PST
Defendant
Thomas A. Ferrara
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Williams
Defendant
Robert Thompson
Defendant
Gabriel Hollingshead
Defendant
Connor Hamilton
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dixon Police Department
Defendant
City of Dixon
Defendant
Chris Carter
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Roy Stockton
Sergeant 530 Union Avenue Suite 100
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Solano County Sheriff's Office
530 Union Avenue Suite 100
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lisa McDowell
Deputy 530 Union Avenue Suite 100
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dalton McCampbell
Deputy 530 Union Avenue Suite 100
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Defendant
County of Solano
675 Texas Street Suite 6600
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Danielle K. Lewis
Selman Breitman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Berry Powell, Jr.
Represented By
Yasin M. Almadani
Almadani Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Nakia Victoria Porter
Represented By
Yasin M. Almadani
Almadani Law
contact info
Plaintiff
A. P.
Represented By
Yasin M. Almadani
Almadani Law
contact info
Plaintiff
L. P.
Represented By
Yasin M. Almadani
Almadani Law
contact info
Plaintiff
O. P.
Represented By
Yasin M. Almadani
Almadani Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
G. LNU
Terminated: 01/07/2022
Defendant
FNU LNU
Terminated: 01/07/2022
Defendant
Aaron LNU
Terminated: 01/07/2022
Defendant
G. Hollingshead
Terminated: 01/07/2022

GPO Dec 09 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/08/21 EXTENDING time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 12/16/21. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jun 07 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/7/22 SETTING a pre-settlement conference for 1/18/2023 at 02:00 PM and SETTING a settlement conference for 1/25/2023 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. No later than 1/11/23, each party must submit a confidential settlement conference statement to Magistrate Judge Peterson. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jun 29 2022
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/29/2022 GRANTING 40 Application for leave, Plaintiffs Nakia V. Porter and Clifton Powell are permitted to continue maintaining this action on behalf of their respective minor children without the appointment of a guardian ad litem or other representative. (Reader, L)
GPO Jun 30 2022
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/30/22 DENYING 41 plaintiffs' Request to Seal. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jul 29 2022
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/28/2022 GRANTING Stipulated Protective Order. APPROVED(Reader, L)
GPO Dec 21 2022
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/20/2022 DENYING 26 Motion to Dismiss, except as to the following claims: The court grants defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' equal protection act claims with leave to amend; The court grants defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Ralph Act claims with leave to amend; The court grants defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' assault and battery claims as to Ms. Porter with leave to amend; and The court grants defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' battery as to the minor children with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint within 30 days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Jan 13 2023
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/13/2023 ORDERING that Fact Discovery shall be completed by 8/25/2023. Expert Disclosures shall be completed by 9/11/2023. Rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 10/9/2023. All dispositive Motions, except for Motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 10/13/2023; and The settlement conference deadline is EXTENDED to 9/1/2023. The parties shall contact the courtroom deputy for Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson to reschedule a date for settlement conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Jul 25 2023
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/24/2023 EXTENDING Case Deadlines as follows: Fact Discovery shall be completed by 11/24/2023. Initial expert witness disclosures and reports shall be completed and exchanged by 12/11/2023. Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports shall be completed by 1/8/2024. All Dispositive Motions except for Motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 1/11/2024. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Nov 09 2023
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/2023 CONTINUING Fact Discovery due by 2/22/2024. Initial Expert Disclosures due by 3/11/2024. Rebuttal Expert by 4/8/2024, and Dispositive Motions filed by 4/10/2024.(Reader, L)
GPO Dec 22 2023
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/21/2023 REASSIGNING this case to Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson solely for the approval of the settlement motion with acceptance signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/21/2023. (Clemente Licea, O)
GPO Jan 24 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/24/24 APPROVING the settlement of minors' claims against City of Dixon defendants. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Feb 16 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER for Psychiatric Examination of Plaintiff Nakia Porter signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/16/2024. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Feb 16 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER for Psychiatric Examination of Plaintiff Joe Berry Powell, Jr. signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/16/2024.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Feb 22 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/22/24 ORDERING that Fact Discovery Cut-Off for the Limited Outstanding Discovery shall be completed by 4/8/24. Initial expert witness disclosures and reports shall be completed and exchanged by 5/8/24. Rebuttal expert witness disclosures and reports shall be completed and exchanged by 6/7/24. All dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be filed by 7/15/24. Oppositions shall be filed by 8/12/24, and replies shall be filed by 8/26/24. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO May 08 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/07/24 DIRECTING the Defendants' Opposition be filed no later than 05/24/24 and Plaintiffs'' Reply brief be filed no later than 06/07/24. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Jul 03 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/3/2024 MODIFYING the page limits on pleadings related to Motions for Summary Judgment. (Woodson, A)
GPO Jul 10 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/09/2024 GRANTING 110 Motion to Amend the Complaint and DENYING 127 Motion For Application as moot. Plaintiffs are directed to file the proposed Amended Complaint within 7 days. (Nair, C)
GPO Jul 23 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/22/2024 ORDERING that the Fact Discovery Cut-Off for the Limited Outstanding Discovery shall be completed by 8/30/24; Supplemental expert disclosures related to Monell liability shall be completed by 09/13/2024; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 09/20/2024; with Oppositions to be filed by 10/18/2024 and Replies to be filed by 11/01/2024. The Dispositive Motions hearing shall be noticed and set for 12/13/2024. (Nair, C)
GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/2024 GRANTING 139 Request for leave to amend the complaint. Within fourteen days, Plaintiffs shall file a further amended complaint reflecting the clarifications and proposals re 139. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Aug 20 2024
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/2024 DIRECTING Defendant Roy Stockton to file a corrected answer within 7 days. (Kyono, V)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/19/2024 SETTING a Status Conference on 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2025. (Becknal, R.)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
227 227 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/08 2:52 PM
MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/8/2025. Plaintiffs' Counsel, Yasin Almadani and Ahmed Ibrahim, present. Defendants' Counsel, Gregory Fox and Danielle Lewis, present. The court heard argument as to Defendants' Motion to Stay (ECF213 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Chuman Certification (ECF211 ) as stated on the record. Motions SUBMITTED. The court next took up the issue of trial scheduling. The parties are DIRECTED to submit a Joint Statement regarding expert discovery by 5/15/2025. Orders to issue. Court Reporter: ECRO (CRN). (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk MCF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
226 226 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 05/07 9:44 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson: All parties present and appearing in person. After discussions with the court, the case did not settle. Plaintiffs Counsel Yasin Almadani and Ahmed Ibrahim present. Defendants Counsel Gregory Fox and Danielle Lewis present. (Deputy Clerk NAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
225 225 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/01 11:47 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALL held on 5/1/2025 telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson: All parties present and appearing telephonically. After discussions with the court, the matter will proceed to the 5/6/2025 settlement conference. Plaintiffs Counsel Yasin Almadani and Ahmed Ibrahim present. Defendants Counsel Gregory Fox and Danielle Lewis present. (Deputy Clerk NAC)
Related: [-]