Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:21-cv-01428
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2021
Terminated:May 10, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 3:30 AM MST
Defendant
Phoenix, City of
Represented By
Stephen Barry Coleman
Pierce Coleman PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Christopher Turiano
Represented By
Michael Napier
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Cassidy Layne Bacon
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info
Eric Reginald Wilson
Napier Coury & Baillie PC
contact info

GPO Feb 04 2022
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and enjoining Defendant the City of Phoenix and its officers, agents, employees, attorneys, and all other persons or entities in active concert or participation with them, for the duration of this action, from pursuing administrative, investigative, or disciplinary proceedings against Plaintiff Christopher Turiano based on his refusal to consent to a search of his personal cell phone data that was imaged in 2018 and is being held by third-party vendor D4 LLC. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/4/22. (SJF)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
64 64 misc Transcript Request Mon 11/18 10:56 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Unknown Parties for proceedings held on 12 07-2021 Judge Michael T Liburdi hearing judge(s). (Berke, Lori)
Related: [-]