Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:21-cv-02651
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Represented By
Delia G Frazier
Dla Piper Llp Us - Atlanta
contact info
John R Wellschlager
Dla Piper Llp Us Md
contact info
Matthew A Holian
Dla Piper Llp Us - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company, The
Plaintiff
Katherine G Grusenski
Represented By
Michael S Werner
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert J Grusenski
Represented By
Michael S Werner
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/28 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Werner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
4 4 misc Status Report Thu 09/16 6:39 PM
STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT BASF CORPORATION'S GENERAL DENIAL AND PRELIMINARY STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by BASF Corp. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 08/18 4:40 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Grusenski et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2651-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Jersey (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/18 4:39 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/18 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10023859.), filed by Robert J Grusenski, Katherine G Grusenski. Service due by 11/16/2021(sshe, )
Related: [-]