Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Arenda L Wright Allen
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:21-cv-00464
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Disability Act)
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2021
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 13, 2022 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
Hampton Roads Shipping Association - ILA
Defendant
ILA #970
Plaintiff
Jeremy Breyon Hudson
5627 Darby Close
Portsmouth, VA 23703


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
16 16 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 11/29 10:24 AM
USCA Mandate re9 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of the court, entered November 7, 2023, takes effect today.This constitutes the formal mandate of the court. 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 appeal USCA Judgment Tue 11/07 1:07 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. The judgments of the district court are affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of the court's mandate. 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal USCA Opinion Tue 11/07 1:05 PM
Opinion of USCA (Copy) AFFIRMED re9 Notice of Appeal. Affirmed by unpublished per curiam opinion. 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Fri 11/25 10:31 AM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re9 Notice of Appeal. 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
13 13 appeal Appeal Remark Tue 11/08 8:55 AM
Appeal Remark re9 Notice of Appeal : RECORD requested from Clerk of Court in 22-2143 22-2144 Due: 11/21/2022. 22-2143 22-2144 (epri, )
Related: [-]
12 12 appeal USCA Order Tue 11/08 8:53 AM
ORDER of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. The court consolidates Case No. 22-2143 and Case No. 22-2144 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 11/08 8:52 AM
USCA Case Number 4CCA 4CCA Case manager Rachel Phillips for9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. 22-2143 (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
10 10 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Fri 11/04 4:11 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re9 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov)(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal
9 9 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 11/04 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
8 8 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 11/03 4:24 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/22. (epri, )
Related: [-]
7 7 7 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/03 4:20 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.3.22. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 11/3/22. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
6 6 misc Docket Annotation Fri 08/05 12:16 PM
Submission by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/27 3:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hampton Roads Shipping Association - ILA, ILA #970, filed by Jeremy Breyon Hudson.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
4 4 cmp Complaint Fri 01/07 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Hampton Roads Shipping Association - ILA, ILA #970, filed by Jeremy Breyon Hudson.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Attachment
3 3 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/07 10:59 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed by filing an Amended Complaint within thirty days from the date of entry of this Order to Show Cause. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 1.7.22. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 1/7/22. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Thu 12/30 2:33 PM
Submission by Jeremy Breyon Hudson. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/18 9:43 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Breyon Hudson.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to IFP,
Att: 2 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit to Complaint