Delaware District Court
Judge:Leonard P Stark
Case #: 1:12-cv-00964
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2012
Terminated:Jun 09, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2016 8:54 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.
Represented By
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
LG Electronics USA Inc.
Represented By
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
FlatWorld Interactives LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Farnan LLP
contact info
Defendant
LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
David M. Fry
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Defendant
LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.
Represented By
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
David M. Fry
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Defendant
LG Electronics USA Inc.
Represented By
Brian A. Tollefson
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
David M. Fry
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
John W. Shaw
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Joo Mee Kim
contact info
Plaintiff
FlatWorld Interactives LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Tyler S. Weaver
contact info
Steve W. Berman
contact info
Mark S. Carlson
contact info
Nicholas S. Boebel
contact info
Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Farnan LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 31 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION - re: Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/31/14. (rwc)
GPO Dec 31 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION - re: Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/31/14. (rwc)

1. Samsung, LG Lose Bid to Toss Touch-Screen Patent Lawsuit (litigationdaily.com)
Submitted Tue 01/06/2015
Docket last updated: 06/09/2016 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 20, 2012
1 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1109747.) - filed by FlatWorld Interactives LLC.(rwc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
Related: [-]
3 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE 43,318 E. (rwc)
Related: [-]