Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:21-cv-00800
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 6:44 AM EST
Defendant
Reliant Roofing Inc.
a Florida corporation Attn: Cameron Shouppe, Registered Agent 8000 Belford Parkway, #200
Jacksonville, FL 32256
Represented By
Christopher Ryan Maloney
Jimerson Birr, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Johann Bowman
1000 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 588 Suite 588
Sunrise, FL 33323
Represented By
David Mitchell Cozad
Levy & Levy, P.A.
contact info
Chad E. Levy
Law Offices Of Levy & Levy, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 06/15 2:32 PM
ORDER ADOPTING 20 Report and Recommendation; GRANTING in part 17 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Referral to Magistrate Judge for Hearing; APPROVING (Doc. 19-3) Settlement Agreement as a fair and reasonable resolution of Plaintiff's FLSA claim. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/15/2022. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
20 20 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 05/13 12:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Reliant Roofing Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/12/2022. (REL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
19 19 26 pgs respm Memorandum in support Thu 12/16 4:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re17 Motion for Settlement Approval filed by Reliant Roofing Inc..(Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 11/23 3:10 PM
ORDER taking under advisement 17 Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Referral to Magistrate Judge for Hearing. The parties must file a memorandum of law supporting their Joint Motion (Doc. 17), including their settlement agreement, any associated releases of claims and any documents they deem relevant to the undersigned's review by December 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/23/2021. (REL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
17 17 motion Settlement Wed 11/17 3:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Referral to Magistrate Judge for Hearing by Reliant Roofing Inc.. (Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
16 16 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/15 1:52 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:21-cv-800-BJD-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/09 1:43 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file on or before November 17, 2021, a joint notice wherein they certify that Plaintiff has received her full claim to unpaid wages, full liquidated damages, and that legal fees and cost will not diminish recovery. Alternatively, the parties may file a motion for approval of settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/8/2021. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/29 1:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Johann Bowman. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/21 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Reliant Roofing Inc.. (Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/21 4:06 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Reliant Roofing Inc..(Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
11 11 misc Verified summary Wed 10/13 10:47 AM
VERIFIED summary by Reliant Roofing Inc.. (Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
10 10 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/21 5:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Telephonic Case Management Conference is GRANTED IN PART. The parties may conduct a video conference in lieu of meeting in person. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/21/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/17 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Telephonic Case Management Conference by Johann Bowman. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
8 8 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Tue 09/14 2:03 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:6 Order by Johann Bowman.(Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, September 03, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/03 12:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Johann Bowman. (Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
6 6 16 pgs order Order Wed 09/01 4:54 PM
FLSA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 08/30/2021. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Wed 08/25 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ryan Maloney on behalf of Reliant Roofing Inc. (Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
4 4 service Waiver of service executed Tue 08/24 2:29 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 8/24/2021 by Reliant Roofing Inc. as to Reliant Roofing Inc.. (Maloney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 08/20 11:52 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Reliant Roofing Inc. (AEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/19 4:20 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:21-cv-800-BJD-JRK. (LRB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/19 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Reliant Roofing Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18611609) filed by Johann Bowman.(Levy, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons