Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Stephen L Crocker
Case #: 3:21-cv-00530
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 3:05 AM CST
Defendant
Dane County
210 Martin Luther King Jr Blvd
Madison, WI 53703
Defendant
David Mahan Flores
Plaintiff
Valerie Flores
P.O. Box 620493
Middleton, WI 53562

GPO Aug 23 2021
ORDER that Plaintiff to submit $402 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Affidavit of Indigency by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/23/2021. (aom),(ps)
GPO May 06 2022
ordingly and close both cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/6/2022. (jef),(ps)ORDER dismissing plaintiff Valerie L. Kreger's cases no. 21-cv-446-jdp and 21-cv-530-jdp. Plaintiff's motion for a jury trial in case no. 21-cv-446-jdp, Dkt. 19, is DENIED as moot. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment acc

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 order Text Only Order Mon 05/05 12:07 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Valerie Flores, who is barred from bringing new civil rights cases in this court without prepaying the filing fee, has filed an identical motion in several closed cases. Flores asks the court to seal each case in its entirety and remove it from electronic legal research databases and Internet search engines. Federal litigation is presumptively public, and Flores hasn't shown that the cases contain any unusually sensitive information that warrants sealing, much less the wholesale sealing requested. Flores's motion is DENIED. The clerk of court is directed to docket this order in these cases: 23-cv-298; 22-cv-122; 21-cv-547; 21-cv-546; 21-cv-530; 21-cv-466; 21-cv-446; 19-cv-741; 18-cv-708; 16-cv-326; 16-cv-283. Further motions in these closed cases will be summarily denied. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/5/25. (jat),(ps)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 motion Seal Fri 05/02 4:03 PM
Motion to Seal Case Caption and Entirety of Case by Plaintiff Valerie L. Flores. (jat),(ps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Address Confidentiality Program Card,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, May 06, 2022
11 11 order Judgment Fri 05/06 5:11 PM
Judgment entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
10 10 6 pgs order Order Fri 05/06 5:02 PM
ORDER dismissing plaintiff Valerie L. Kreger's cases no. 21-cv-446-jdp and 21-cv-530-jdp. Plaintiff's motion for a jury trial in case no. 21-cv-446-jdp, Dkt. 19, is DENIED as moot. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close both cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/6/2022. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
9 9 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/06 1:58 PM
Certificate of Service as to David Flores (U.S. Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit form) by Plaintiff Valerie Flores. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 24, 2021
8 8 misc Exhibit Fri 09/24 5:26 PM
Copy of dkt.2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis from case 21-cv-529-jdp by Plaintiff Valerie L. Kreger re: (8 in 3:21-cv-00547-jdp, 8 in 3:21-cv-00466-jdp, 7 in 3:21-cv-00529-jdp, 7 in 3:21-cv-00530-jdp, 6 in 3:21-cv-00546-jdp, 9 in 3:21-cv-00446-jdp). (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Fri 09/24 5:19 PM
Letter from plaintiff regarding waiver of fees. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, September 10, 2021
6 6 misc Letter Fri 09/10 1:50 PM
Letter from Clerk's office response to letter from plaintiff on September 10, 2021. (jef),(ps)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Fri 09/10 1:27 PM
Letter from plaintiff regarding needing an extension to file a waiver of fees in all open cases. (jef),(ps) Letter submitted via fax on 9/10/2021 (jef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fax cover sheet
Friday, August 27, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/27 11:28 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/27/2021. (aom),(ps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/26 4:17 PM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Valerie L. Kreger. (aom),(ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
2 2 order Initial Pro Se Order on ifp Mon 08/23 10:39 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff to submit $402 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Affidavit of Indigency by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/23/2021. (aom),(ps)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/20 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Valerie L. Kreger. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom),(ps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons