California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 4:21-cv-06472
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 1:45 AM PST
Defendant
Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc.
Represented By
Haley M Morrison
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Megan Ruth Reuther
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Washburn
BRYAN SCHWARTZ LAW 180 Grand Avenue, Suite 1380
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Samuel L. Goldsmith
Bryan Schwartz Law
contact info
Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Bryan Schwartz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 03, 2022
44 44 2 pgs JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/3/2022. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
43 43 5 pgs Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 39 FLSA and PAGA Settlement Approval AS AMENDED. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
42 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 6/2/2022 re 39 MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 38 filed by Julie Washburn. No one present in the virtual courtroom objected to the settlement. The Court found the settlement appropriate and will approve the settlement. Total Time in Court: 1 minute. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:33 - 2:34. Plaintiff Attorney: Bryan Schwartz. Defendant Attorney: Megan Reuther. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2022)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
41 41 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR 6/2/2022, MOTION HEARING RE39 MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 38 . Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, May 27, 2022, by 10:00 a.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
40 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Defendant's Response to Unopposed Motion for FLSA and PAGA Settlement Approval filed byPendleton Woolen Mills, Inc..
Related: [-] 39 MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 38 uther, Megan
Friday, April 22, 2022
39 39 MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 38 filed by Julie Washburn. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/6/2022. Replies due by 5/13/2022.(Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Schwartz Decl ISO Settlement Approval,
Att: 2 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 1_Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 2_Bryan Schwartz Law Fee Table,
Att: 4 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 3_Case Costs,
Att: 5 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 4_Duran_Order & Motion to Deny Class Cert,
Att: 6 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 5_Alila-Katita v. U.S. Bank final dismissal,
Att: 7 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 6_Gerlach v. Wells Fargo,
Att: 8 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 7_Mojica v. Compass,
Att: 9 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 8_O'Sullivan Final Approval,
Att: 10 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 9_In re Novartis Final Approval,
Att: 11 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 10_Sanchez v. McDonalds Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 11_Daily Journal re Sanchez v. McDonald's,
Att: 13 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 12_NERA Settlement Study,
Att: 14 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 13_Steve Pearl CV,
Att: 15 Exhibit Washburn Decl ISO Settlement Approval,
Att: 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 17 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment,
Att: 18 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service
Thursday, April 21, 2022
38 38 NOTICE by Julie Washburn of Motion and Unopposed Motion for FLSA and PAGA Settlement Approval(Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Declaration Schwartz Decl ISO Settlement Approval,
Att: 2 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 1_Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 2_Bryan Schwartz Law Fee Table,
Att: 4 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 3_Case Costs,
Att: 5 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 4_Duran_Order & Motion to Deny Class Cert,
Att: 6 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 5_Alila-Katita v. U.S. Bank final dismissal,
Att: 7 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 6_Gerlach v. Wells Fargo,
Att: 8 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 7_Mojica v. Compass,
Att: 9 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 8_O'Sullivan Final Approval,
Att: 10 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 9_In re Novartis Final Approval,
Att: 11 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 10_Sanchez v. McDonalds Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 11_Daily Journal re Sanchez v. McDonald's,
Att: 13 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 12_NERA Settlement Study,
Att: 14 Exhibit Decl Schwartz Ex 13_Steve Pearl CV,
Att: 15 Declaration Washburn Decl ISO Settlement Approval,
Att: 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Settlement,
Att: 17 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment,
Att: 18 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:38 Notice (Other),,,, filed by Julie Washburn (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
37 37 NOTICE OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn (Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 3/8/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
36 36 NOTICEOF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b))3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
35 35 NOTICE by Julie Washburn OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
34 34 NOTICE OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORMS UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS AC (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn (Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 2/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
33 33 NOTICE by Julie Washburn OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
32 32 NOTICE by Julie Washburn OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
31 31 NOTICE by Julie Washburn OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
30 30 NOTICE OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/28/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Friday, December 17, 2021
29 29 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc.. (Morrison, Haley) Modified on 12/20/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
28 28 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/16/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
27 27 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/15/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, December 13, 2021
26 26 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/14/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
25 25 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 24 Motion for Amended Stipulated Protective Order. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 MOTION for Protective Order Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2021. Replies due by 1/3/2022. (Morrison, Haley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
23 23 NOTICE OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) by Julie Washburn(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/13/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
22 22 ORDER re Compliance with Civil Standing Order. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/10/2021. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
21 21 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc. and Julie Washburn. Responses due by 12/20/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Morrison, Haley) Modified on 12/7/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
20 20 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 19 Joint Stipulation to Send Notice to Collective. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
19 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Julie Washburn and Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc..(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 12/2/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, November 22, 2021
18 18 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 17 Joint Stipulation to Provide Notice to Putative Collective Action Members under the Fair Labor Standards Act. (vclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
17 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Julie Washburn and Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc..(Goldsmith, Samuel) Modified on 11/22/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 11/17/2021. Parties to submit a stipulation to conditional certification by 11/19. Proposed notice to the collective is due by 12/1. Notice to include a proposed deadline in sending the notice to the collective members and specify how the notice will be sent. Case Schedule Last day to amend pleadings: 1/18/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2022 at 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Discovery cutoff: 9/12/2022. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Total Time in Court: 6 Minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 1:15 - 1:21. Plaintiff Attorney: Samuel Goldsmith. Defendant Attorney: Megan Reuther. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2021)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
15 15 Joint Case Management Statement and Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) Report filed by Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc. and Julie Washburn. Related [+] Modified on 11/12/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] uther, Megan
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley M Morrison as Counsel for Defendant Pendleton Woolen Mills (Morrison, Haley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel Haley M. Morrison must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Re:13 Notic e of Appearance filed by Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ruth Reuther and Haley M. Morrison as Counsel for Defendant Related [+]
Related: [-] uther, Megan
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julie Washburn (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
11 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJulie Washburn. (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING DATE AND TIME FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. The Court's normal day and time for hearing Case Management Conferences will now be Wednesdays, at 1:00 p.m., until further notice. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Wednesday, November 10th, 2021, by no later than 10:00AM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . (bxsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
9 9 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 02:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances:< /b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday November 18th, 2021 by no later than 10:00AM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] .< /p> (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,. (bxsS, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/25/2021.(mbcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
6 6 Summons Issued as to Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/20 21. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Julie Washburn.. (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/7/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/20 4:24 PM
NOTICE by Julie Washburn OF CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORM UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (29 U.S.C. § 216(b)) (Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/20 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Pendleton Woolen Mills, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16307146.). Filed byJulie Washburn.(Goldsmith, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons