Hawaii District Court
Judge:Helen Gillmor
Case #: 1:21-cv-00355
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 05, 2022
Last checked: Friday Feb 18, 2022 10:32 PM HST
Defendant
Roberts Hawaii, Inc.
Represented By
John D. Zalewski
Case Lombardi & Pettit
contact info
Steven E. Tom
Case Lombardi & Pettit
contact info
Plaintiff
Vince Picar
Represented By
Charles H. Brower
Pioneer Plaza
contact info
Michael P. Healy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM HST
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
51 51 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 10/05 8:31 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE entered on 10/5/2022 pursuant to ECF50 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. (jni)
Related: [-]
50 50 4 pgs order Order Wed 10/05 8:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 10/4/2022. Plaintiff's Disability Discrimination claim pursuant to the Americans with Disability Act of 1990 (Count I) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's Hawaii Whistleblowers' Protection Act claim (Count II) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is ordered to CLOSE THE CASE. (jni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
49 49 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/04 3:01 PM
NOTICE by Roberts Hawaii, Inc. NOTICE OF DISAFFILIATION OF COUNSEL Roberts Hawaii, Inc..(Zalewski, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 03, 2022
47 47 minutes 1 - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R) 3 - Set Ripe Deadline Mon 10/03 2:00 PM
EO: On August 10, 2022, Defendant Roberts Hawaii, Inc. filed: DEFENDANT ROBERTS HAWAII, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 39 ). On August 12, 2022, the Court issued a briefing schedule and set a hearing on the Motion for Tuesday, October 4, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. (ECF No.41 ). The hearing set for Tuesday, October 4, 2022 is VACATED. The Court elects to decide Defendant Roberts Hawaii, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 39 ) without a hearing pursuant to District of Hawaii Local Rule 7.1(c). (SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls)
Related: [-]
minutes 2 - Set Hearings Mon 10/03 4:56 PM
EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar and with the agreement of the parties, the Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2022 is CONTINUED to 11/10/2022 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Teleconference (VTC). The Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by 11/3/2022. The parties are directed to consult Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter's Standing Order Regarding Settlement Conferences, available on the Court's public website, regarding the format of the confidential settlement conference statement and settlement conference procedures. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
Related: [-]