Shumaker v. Burgess Services LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-02291 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 20, 2022 2:55 AM MST |
Defendant
Burgess Services LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Shumaker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Jackie Shumaker Against Burgess Services LLC by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
![]() RESPONSE to38 Writ of Garnishment Issued PCL Construction Services, Inc. Response to Writ of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service on PCL Construction Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Judgment Debtor Other Than Natural Person37 as to PCL Construction Services, Inc. issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Hensel Phelps Construction Co, by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
35 | 35
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Turner Construction Company by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
![]() WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Judgment Debtor Other Than Natural Person32 as to Turner Construction Company issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) |
|
33 | 33
![]() WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Judgment Debtor Other Than Natural Person31 as to Hensel Phelps Construction Co. issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
31 | 31
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
29 | 29
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Robinson, Edmund) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Whitmore, Stephen) |
|
27 | 27
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Whitmore, Stephen) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Mon 05/08 12:31 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:23 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen M. Whitmore. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Whitmore, Stephen) |
|
24 | 24
![]() APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Garnishment by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Whitmore, Stephen) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Stephen M. Whitmore by Stephen Morgan Whitmore on behalf of Jackie ShumakerAttorney Stephen Morgan Whitmore added to party Jackie Shumaker(pty:pla) (Whitmore, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Jackie Shumaker against Burgess Services LLC pursuant to the21 Order. Entered by Clerk on 9/9/2022. (hguer) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment20 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. The Clerk shall enter DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Burgess Services, LLC in the amount of $9,229.50, consisting of $5,000 in statutory damages, $3642.50 in attorney's fees, and $587 in costs . Plaintiff is awarded post-judgment interest on the foregoing sums from the date judgment is entered at the rate set by 28 U.S.C. § 1961. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/8/2022.(trvo, ) |
|
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker.(Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 12/01 11:38 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Burgess Services LLC re18 Motion for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. By CLERK. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) |
||
Monday, November 29, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Entry of Default as to by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker.(Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
order
Clerks Note Regarding Default
Mon 11/29 9:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT re16 Motion for Entry of Default by Jackie Shumaker. Default will not be entered as to Burgess Services LLC as the date upon which service was effectuated is incorrect on the Declaration. The corrected Request for Entry of Default must be refiled again as one complete filing. By CLERK. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) |
||
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Entry of Default as to by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker.(Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 November 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Pursuant to this Court's August 26, 2021 minute order (ECF8 ), the parties were to submit a proposed scheduling order on or before October 26, 2021 (namely, five business days before the scheduling conference). The parties have not done so. This may be due, in large part, to the fact that Defendant has not entered an appearance in this matter. In fact, Defendant has not answered or responded to the operative pleading since the deadline to do so is November 3, 2021. ECF12 . Accordingly, this case is not ready for a scheduling conference. Therefore, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for November 2, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for November 22, 2021, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, ) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Shumaker. Burgess Services LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 August 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, ) |
|
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jtorr, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Reassigning Judge
Wed 08/25 9:10 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly and has therefore been randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02291-WJM. (Text only entry.) (jtorr, ) |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/25 3:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/25/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) |
||
order
Order
Wed 08/25 3:29 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 25/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 24, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Burgess Services LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8037190)Attorney Sergio Calderon Baron added to party Jackie Shumaker(pty:pla), filed by Jackie Shumaker.(Calderon Baron, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 08/25 8:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) |