California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Kendall J Newman
Case #: 2:21-cv-01500
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2021
Terminated:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 1:16 AM PST
Defendant
Julie Baumgartner
Defendant
County of Sacramento
Defendant
Herbert Haines
Defendant
Kia Phillips
Defendant
Joe Robinson
Defendant
VOA (Volunteers of America)
Defendant
Karl Williams
Defendant
Woodspring Suites
Plaintiff
Morrey Selck
4391 Stockton Blvd
Sacramento, CA 95820

GPO Nov 12 2021
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/2021 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 30 days of this order, plaintiff shall file either a first amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action. Failure to file either a first amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal by this deadline may result in the imposition of sanctions, including potential dismissal of the action with prejudice. (Huang, H)
GPO Jan 18 2022
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2022 RECOMMENDING that this action 4 1 be dismissed. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Feb 09 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/08/2022 ADOPTING 5 Findings and Recommendations in full. DISMISSING this action for failure to state claim. CASE CLOSED. (Rodriguez, E)

Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
8 8 order Judgment Wed 02/09 10:03 AM
JUDGMENT dated *02/08/2022* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/08/2022. (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Wed 02/09 10:02 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/08/2022 ADOPTING5 Findings and Recommendations in full. DISMISSING this action for failure to state claim. CASE CLOSED. (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Wed 02/09 10:04 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and8 Judgment served on Morrey Selck. (Rodriguez, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
6 6 respoth Objections to Findings and Recommendations Tue 02/01 3:43 PM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS5 by Plaintiff Morrey Selck. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
5 5 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 01/18 1:04 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2022 RECOMMENDING that this action4 1 be dismissed. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 01/18 1:04 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Findings and Recommendations, served on Morrey Selck. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/07 11:57 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Morrey Selck.(Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
3 3 11 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/12 9:00 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/2021 GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 30 days of this order, plaintiff shall file either a first amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action. Failure to file either a first amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal by this deadline may result in the imposition of sanctions, including potential dismissal of the action with prejudice. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 11/12 9:01 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, served on Morrey Selck. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/24 2:55 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Morrey Selck. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/24 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Morrey Selck. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet