Cashman Dredging and Marine Contracting Co., LLC v. Belesimo et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Referred: | Jennifer C Boal |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-11398 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 21, 2022 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
Frank Belesimo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Callan Marine, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cashman Dredging and Marine Contracting Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
139 | 139
respm
Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/24 2:45 PM
Opposition re115 MOTION Exclude Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Report, Opinion, and Testimony of David Sun filed by Cashman Dredging and Marine Contracting Co., LLC. (Francis, Jeffrey) |
|
138 | 138
respm
Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/24 1:43 PM
Opposition re119 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Proffered Expert Report, Opinion, and Testimony of Kimberly A. Train filed by Cashman Dredging and Marine Contracting Co., LLC. (Conroy, Melanie) (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) SEALED Unredacted Main Document | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
137 | 137
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 04/17 4:15 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing110 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memoranda Supporting Summary Judgment ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
136 | 136
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 04/17 4:12 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing108 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of/Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Assented-To); Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Cook, Savannah) |