Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-01343
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2021
Terminated:Nov 29, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Aug 26, 2021 2:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana (1)
Represented By
Ariana Salinas
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Aaron Robert Petters
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/17/2021 3:09 PM CST
Saturday, July 10, 2021
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 7/12/2021 at 01:35 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (clrodriguezadi, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana, filed.(clrodriguezadi, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on July 10, 2021 at 03:31 PM as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (clrodriguez, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
Attorney update in case as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana added. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana held on 7/12/2021. Defendant consented to proceeding by video conference. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Detention Pending Trial. No bond set. Defendant orally waives preliminary and detention hearing. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f). Parties appeared via Zoom. Defendant sworn in and consented to Video Conference. Appearances: Francisco Jose Rodriguez AUSA; FPD Rolando Charles (on duty); USPO: Jesse Berber; USM: Deputy Cantu. (Opened/Adjourned: 2:28 PM - 2:31 PM) (ERO: Margaret Peregoy) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Prelim Detention Hearing as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana: Defendant orally waived on 7/12/2021 before the Court. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana, filed. Agent: Mario Villanueva (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana, filed. (vcaballero, 5). [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. Detention Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ariana Salinas, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana, filed.(Salinas, Ariana) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
11 11 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (FernandoJRodriguez, 5) [5:21-mj-01662]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
12 12 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Arnoldo Luis Noriega-Magana (1) count(s) 1, filed. (VeronicaCantuadi, 5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment