O'Neil v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02759 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 22, 2022 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael O'Neil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Michael O'Neil. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-02759-RMG(Zgoda, Richard) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/26 3:36 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), O'Neil v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-2759-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: New Hampshire (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10040010.), filed by Michael O'Neil. Service due by 11/24/2021(sshe, ) |