Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-mj-00618
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2021
Last checked: Friday Aug 27, 2021 2:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Luis Bravo (1)
Represented By
Douglas G Smith, II
Federal Public Defender'S Office (muskogee)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shannon Bears Cozzoni
United States Attorney'S Office (tulsa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/27/2021 3:09 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
ARREST on Charges Pending in Another District(Rule 5) as to Jose Luis Bravo (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jose Luis Bravo [Note: Attorney Shannon Bears Cozzoni added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Cozzoni, Shannon)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Jose Luis Bravo (Cozzoni, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1 MOTION for Detention
3 3 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings held on 8/25/2021 , appointing FPD attorney Douglas G Smith, II for Jose Luis Bravo, ordering defendant be detained, ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #1 & #2 moot as to Jose Luis Bravo Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 1 MOTION for Detention ,2 MOTION for Hearing
4 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , appointing FPD attorney as to Jose Luis Bravo (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearing by Jose Luis Bravo (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT to Another District (Rule5) by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne as to Jose Luis Bravo (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE to USCD WD/MO of a Rule 5 Initial Appearance as to Jose Luis Bravo. Your case number is: 21-200-01-W-RK. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require a financial ledger and/or certified copies of any documents, please send a request to CM-ECFIntake_oknd@oknd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. as to Jose Luis Bravo (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]