Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: Holly B Fitzsimmons
Case #: 3:21-cv-01149
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2021
Terminated:Sep 12, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 02, 2022 3:30 PM EDT
Defendant
Connecticut State Colleges and Universities
Represented By
Stephanie A Wainwright
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Inez M. Diaz Galloza
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarah Tischbein Bold
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Kripp
Represented By
Stephanie A Wainwright
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Inez M. Diaz Galloza
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarah Tischbein Bold
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Alice Pritchard
Represented By
Stephanie A Wainwright
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Inez M. Diaz Galloza
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarah Tischbein Bold
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Board of Regents of Higher Education
Represented By
Stephanie A Wainwright
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Inez M. Diaz Galloza
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarah Tischbein Bold
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Robert Steinmetz
Represented By
Stephanie A Wainwright
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Inez M. Diaz Galloza
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Sarah Tischbein Bold
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Esposito
Represented By
Todd D. Steigman
Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, Llc-Htfd
contact info
William G. Madsen
Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, Llc-Htfd
contact info
Jacques J. Parenteau
Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, Llc-Nl
contact info

GPO Feb 22 2022
ORDER and MEMORANDUM of Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/22/22. (Guerrier, C.)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
misc Clerk's Disbursement of Funds Wed 06/07 11:33 AM
Clerk's Disbursement of Funds-CHECK#4039-47616821 in the amount of $500.00 paid to MADSEN, PRESTLEY & PARENTEAU LLC. REF NO. PQC CTXCCA23-00024. (Morley, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
order Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation Tue 05/23 5:52 PM
ORDER granting121 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/23/2023. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]