14
|
|
14
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 12/16 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Transcript
Tue 12/16 3:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/14/2014 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Remark
Thu 12/04 11:25 AM
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued to J & J Sports Productions, Inc. and against Hashi Sushi Fusion, Inc. and Lilliana Rodriguez in the amount of $7,938.25. (km)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Judgment - Default
Fri 11/14 4:29 PM
JUDGMENT: that the plaintiff have judgment against defendants in the amount of $7,418.25; plus costs and disbursements in the amount of $520.00, amounting in all to $7,938.25. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/14/2014) (tn)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
minutes
Default Hearing
Fri 11/14 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Default Hearing held on 11/14/2014. (Court Reporter Steven Griffing) (Lopez, Jose)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
order
Order
Wed 10/15 10:14 AM
ORDER. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for October 21, 2014, is hereby adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/15/2014) (rjm)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 10/14 3:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affidavit In Support Of Order To Show Cause, Affirmation In Further Support Of Judgment By Default and Plaintiff's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Request For Judgment By Default served on Liliana Rodriguez on 10/13/02014. Service was accepted by Affixing To Door. Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Hooten, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Tue 10/14 3:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affidavit In Support Of Order To Show Cause, Affirmation In Further Support Of Judgment By Default and Plaintiff's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Request For Judgment By Default served on Hashi Sushi Fusion, Inc. d/b/a Hashi on 10/10/2014. Service was accepted by Chad Matice, Authorized Person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Hooten, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/08 3:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that defendants shall show cause as to why an order allowing the plaintiff to enter a default judgment against the defendant and for other and further relief as may be just and proper should not be granted. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Opposition papers, if any, are to be filed on or before October 28, 2014. Reply papers, if any, are to be filed on or before November 5, 2014. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2014. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/6/2014) (tn)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/08 3:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 11/5/2014. (tn)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 09/11 1:06 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Hashi Sushi Fusion, Inc. d/b/a Hashi and Liliana Rodriguez. (km)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Certificate of Service Other
Mon 08/25 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on Hashi Sushi Fusion, Inc. d/b/a Hashi and Liliana Rodriguez on 8/25/2014. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Hooten, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/25 2:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Liliana Rodriguez served on 8/19/2014, answer due 9/9/2014. Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Hooten, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/25 2:37 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Hashi Sushi Fusion Inc. served on 8/19/2014, answer due 9/9/2014. Service was accepted by Chad Matice, Authorized Person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Hooten, Paul)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on October 21, 2014, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/13/2014) (ja)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Paul J. Hooten for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT PDF OF CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Paul J. Hooten, to submit PDF of the Civil Cover Sheet. Email a copy of Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (moh).
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Hashi Sushi Fusion Inc., Liliana Rodriguez. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1101256)Document filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc..(laq) (moh).
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hashi Sushi Fusion Inc., Liliana Rodriguez. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
|