Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00069
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 28, 2021 2:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Victor Chavez, Jr (1)
Represented By
Lorren L Lucero
Lucero Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Meredith Elizabeth Pinkham-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office - Criminal Amarillo
contact info
Joshua Jerome Frausto-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Anna Marie Bell-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2022
Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Victor Chavez, Jr. Re: 48 Consent Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/28/2022) (mcrd)
GPO Jul 13 2022
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION CONCERNING PLEA OF GUILTY Re: 54 Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea as to Victor Chavez, Jr. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 7/13/2022) (awc)

Docket last updated: 09/20/2021 5:14 AM CDT
Thursday, August 26, 2021
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Victor Chavez, Jr (1) count(s) 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (daa)
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Victor Chavez, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 8/27/2021 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/26/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SCHEDULING ARRAIGNMENT AND NOTICE OF WAIVER OF APPEARANCE as to Victor Chavez, Jr: Arraignment set for 9/1/2021 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 8/26/2021) (daa)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lorren L Lucero (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for Victor Chavez, Jr (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Counsel is served with a copy of the[LINK:General Order Regarding the Use of Interpreters in Criminal Cases Filed in the Amarillo Division.] Clerk to mail a copy to any attorney who does not receive electronic notice of this entry.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Lucero, Lorren) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 8/27/2021) (awc).
Related: [-]