Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-mj-01830
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Aug 28, 2021 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Kamie Taylor Jasinski (1)
Represented By
Nicole DeBorde
Deborde Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Shapir Rascoe (2)
Terminated: 08/27/2021
Represented By
Ali R Fazel
Fazel Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/28/2021 3:24 AM CDT
Thursday, August 26, 2021
Arrest (Rule 40) of Kamie Taylor Jasinski, Daniel Shapir Rascoe. (rcastro, 4)
Related: [-]
***Set Hearing as to Kamie Taylor Jasinski, Daniel Shapir Rascoe: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 8/26/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (rcastro, 4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Kamie Taylor Jasinski. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Texas Eastern District Court 4:20cr382 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Identity and Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: AUSA Stephanie Bauman f/USA; Molly Bagshaw appearing for N. Deborde appearing for Nicole DeBorde (CJA) f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Daniel Shapir Rascoe. Defendant first appearance on Indictment from the Texas Eastern District Court 4:20cr382 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant appeared without counsel, Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed. Order appointing private counsel will be entered, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Identity and Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: AUSA Stephanie Bauman f/USA.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Copy of Third Superseding Indictment from the Eastern District of Texas - Sherman Division 4:20-cr-382 as to Kamie Taylor Jasinski, filed.(rcastro, 4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Copy of Third Superseding Indictment from the Eastern District of Texas - Sherman Division 4:20-cr-382 as to Daniel Shapir Rascoe, filed.(rcastro, 4)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Kamie Taylor Jasinski. Nicole DeBorde appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Kamie Taylor Jasinski Identity and Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Daniel Shapir Rascoe. Ali Fazel appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Daniel Shapir Rascoe Identity and Detention Hearing set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4)
Related: [-]