Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:21-mj-06445
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2021
Terminated:Aug 30, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Howard Schwartz (1)
Represented By
Michael Salnick
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ajay Alexander
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/13/2023 8:34 PM EST
Friday, July 30, 2021
Set/Reset Hearings as to Matthew Howard Schwartz: Initial Appearance set for 7/30/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (tpl)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Matthew Howard Schwartz (1). (tpl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow: Initial Appearance as to Matthew Howard Schwartz held on 7/30/2021. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 7/30/2021. Arraignment set for 8/13/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 8/4/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 8/2/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (Digital 11:20:34) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/30/2021. (tpl)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Salnick appearing for Matthew Howard Schwartz . Attorney Michael Salnick added to party Matthew Howard Schwartz(pty:dft). (Salnick, Michael)
Related: [-]