Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:21-cv-01680
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2021
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 26, 2022 5:21 AM EST
Defendant
Shannon Blankenship
Represented By
Andrew N. Yosowitz
Teetor Westfall - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Levorchick
in his individual and official capacity as Ottawa County Sheriff 315 Madison Street
Port Clinton, OH 43452
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Ottawa County
315 Madison Street
Port Clinton, OH 43452
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Szabo
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Schee
Represented By
Joseph X. Michaels
Croson, Taub, & Michaels
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority, (Doc. No. 52), and the Defendants' motions for summary judgment on all claims asserted in the Complaint. (Doc. Nos. 39 and 41). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/21/2025. (M,SM)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
54 54 order Judgment Fri 02/21 10:12 AM
Judgment Entry : For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed contemporaneously, I grant Plaintiff Stephanie Schee's motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority, (Doc. No.52 ), and I grant Defendants' motions for summary judgment. (Doc. Nos.39 and41 ). re53 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/21/2025. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
53 53 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order Fri 02/21 10:08 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority, (Doc. No.52 ), and the Defendants' motions for summary judgment on all claims asserted in the Complaint. (Doc. Nos.39 and41 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/21/2025. (M,SM)
Related: [-]