Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:21-cv-00351
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2021
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Defendant
Ashley Dowell
Defendant
Cortney Dennis
Defendant
Diana Carnell
Defendant
Janie Dressen
Defendant
Karen Neill
Defendant
Lisa Bostaph
Defendant
Mike Matthews
Defendant
Parole Hearing Officer
Defendant
R. David Moore
Defendant
Rich Willis
Defendant
Sandy Jones
Defendant
The Idaho Commission of Pardons and Parole
Plaintiff
Elias Manuel Custodio

GPO Aug 27 2022
INITIAL REVIEW ORDERBY SCREENING JUDGE - Plaintiff may proceed on the Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim against Ashley Dowell, Sandy Jones, Lisa Bostaph, Rich Willis, Karen Neill, Corney Dennis, R. David Moore, Mike Matthews, Janie Dressen, Diana Carnell, and John/Jane Doe Parole Hearing Officer. All other claims against all other Defendants are DISMISSED, and all other Defendants are TERMINATED as parties to this action. Defendants will be allowed to waive service of summons by executing, or having their counsel execute, the Waiver of Service of Summons as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d) and returning it to the Court within 30 days. The Clerk of Court will forward a copy of the Complaint (Dkt. 3) with exhibits, a copy of this Order, and a Waiver of Service of Summons to the following counsel via the ECF system: Mary Karin Magnelli. Pursuant to General Order 324, this action is hereby returned to the Clerk of the Court for random civil case assignment. The Clerk of the Court shall send notice to the Pro Bono Coordinator. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
GPO Mar 24 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00351-BLW, 1:21-cv-00337-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
104 104 misc Response (generic) Tue 04/22 2:21 PM
BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO Plaintiff's Second Summary Judgment re85 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elias Manuel Custodio.(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Prisoner eFile Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit #2,
Att: 4 Exhibit #3
103 103 motion Set Aside Judgment Tue 04/22 2:06 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Plaintiff Elias Manuel Custodio. Responses due by 5/13/2025(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Prisoner eFile Cover Sheet
102 102 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/22 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by All Plaintiffs - Address has been updated (lm)
Related: [-]