Utah District Court
Judge:Dee Benson
Case #: 1:14-cv-00096
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2014
Terminated:May 28, 2015
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 7:18 AM MDT
Defendant
Denise Garza
Represented By
Douglas P. Farr
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
James Delos Gardner
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Stewart O. Peay
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Defendant
Heart and Soul Adoptions
Represented By
Douglas P. Farr
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
James Delos Gardner
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Stewart O. Peay
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Defendant
Rachel Patten
Represented By
Douglas P. Farr
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
James Delos Gardner
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Stewart O. Peay
Snell & Wilmer (ut)
contact info
Plaintiff
Martha Walker Agarwal
Represented By
Wesley D. Hutchins
The Hutchins Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Suneet Krishna Agarwal
Represented By
Wesley D. Hutchins
The Hutchins Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, May 28, 2015
29 29 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/28 10:42 AM
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/28/15. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
28 28 motion Dismiss Wed 05/27 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten.(Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 20, 2015
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 04/20 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten (Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
26 26 order Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion Tue 04/07 3:52 PM
ORDER re 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing. Follows oral order of 2/20/15. See order for details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/7/15. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2015
25 25 misc Modification of Docket Fri 03/13 1:47 PM
Modification of Docket: re24 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion,23 Objections. Please see corrections to the docket for these entries. (jlw)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/13 9:44 AM
Response Objecting to Plaintiff's Proposed Order23 filed by Defendant Heart and Soul Adoptions.(Farr, Douglas) Modified on 3/13/2015 by correcting text from reply to response (jlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss
Friday, March 06, 2015
23 23 respoth Objections Fri 03/06 9:13 AM
OBJECTIONS to 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,,,, (Defendants' Proposed Order Not Previously filed with the Court) filed by Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal. (Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
22 22 respoth Objections Fri 03/06 9:03 AM
OBJECTIONS to 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,,,, (emailed to counsel and the Court yesterday evening due to CM/ECF filing issues) filed by Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal. (Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 20, 2015
21 21 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/23 1:30 PM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held on8 Motion to Dismiss, Court ruled: Granting in Part and Denying in Part8 Motion to Dismiss. Court made findings on the record. Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2015 re8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten. Attorney for Plaintiff: Wesley D. Hutchins, Attorney for Defendant Stewart Peay and Douglas P. Farr. Court Reporter: Ed Young. Related [+]
Related: [-] b
Thursday, February 12, 2015
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 02/12 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 at 02:30 PM in ***NEW COURTROOM***Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. Related [+]
Related: [-] b
19 19 misc Substitution of Counsel Thu 02/12 2:47 PM
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Stewart O. Peay replacing James Delos Gardner as counsel on behalf of Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten. (Peay, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 01/07 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Related [+]
Related: [-] b
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
17 17 misc Request to Submit for Decision Tue 01/06 1:49 PM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re15 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion,8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support ,11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal. (Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 09, 2014
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 12/11 4:03 PM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/9/14. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 08, 2014
15 15 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/08 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten. (Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion File Excess Pages Mon 12/08 3:06 PM
Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten.(Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
13 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Replies due by 12/8/2014.. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/19/14. (jlw)
Related: [-]
12 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten.(Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 07, 2014
11 11 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal.(Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A; Carlton Petition
Friday, October 03, 2014
10 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiffs shall have until 11/7/14 to file their response. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/3/14. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 02, 2014
9 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Suneet Krishna Agarwal.(Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, September 04, 2014
8 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten.(Farr, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Adoptive Parent Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NIIS,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Child Placing Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Adoptive Parent Match Fee Statement
Thursday, August 28, 2014
7 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Denise Garza answer due 9/4/2014; Heart and Soul Adoptions answer due 9/4/2014; Rachel Patten answer due 9/4/2014. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/25/14. (jlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
6 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal, Defendants Denise Garza, Heart and Soul Adoptions, Rachel Patten.(Gardner, James) Modified by striking plaintiffs as filers on 8/20/2014 (rks). Modified on 8/29/2014 by changing from motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion for extension of time to file answer (jlw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 30, 2014
5 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Heart and Soul Adoptions. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
Related: [-]
4 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Rachel Patten. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
Related: [-]
3 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Denise Garza. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2096642), filed by Suneet Krishna Agarwal, Martha Walker Agarwal. Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Hutchins, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A--Adoptive Parent Agreement
1 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiffs Martha Walker Agarwal, Suneet Krishna Agarwal is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (bdr)
Related: [-]