Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-34114

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:21-ap-03902
Nature of Suit51 Bankruptcy - Revocation of confirmation
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2021
Terminated:Aug 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Valaris PLC
Represented By
Valaris PLC
contact info
Defendant
Luminus Management LLC
Represented By
Luminus Management LLC
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 - 50
Represented By
Does 1 - 50
contact info
Plaintiff
Sebastian Miralles Acuna
Represented By
Sebastian Miralles Acuna
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/24 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Generic Order
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/24 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Monday, August 22, 2022
34 34 misc Stipulation Mon 08/22 8:42 PM
Stipulation By Valaris PLC and Sebastian Miralles Acuna. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Valaris PLC ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc AO435 Transcript Request Mon 08/22 3:51 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Sebastian Miralles Acuna. This is to order a transcript of 8/24/2022 before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Sebastian Miralles Acuna ). (JosephWells)
Related: [-]
32 32 5 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 08/22 12:42 PM
Order Denying Motion for Request for Statement of Decision Related [+] Signed on 8/22/2022. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 31
31 31 5 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 08/22 9:29 AM
Motion Request for Statement of Decision Filed by Sebastian Miralles Acuna (JosephWells)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form) Mon 08/22 9:25 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to28 Transcript. Parties notified Related [+] (ShannonHolden)
Related: [-] 28 Transcript
Friday, August 19, 2022
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
28 28 107 pgs court Transcript Fri 08/19 10:41 PM
Transcript RE: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding held on 8/17/22 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 11/17/2022. (AccessTranscripts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
27 27 1 pgs audio MP3 Wed 08/17 6:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/17/2022 3:12:21 PM ]. File Size [ 38791 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:20:49 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs audio MP3 Wed 08/17 6:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/17/2022 1:27:32 PM ]. File Size [ 43575 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:30:47 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Dismissing Adversary Case Wed 08/17 4:45 PM
Dismissal Order in 4:21-ap-3902, Signed on 8/17/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 08/17 4:34 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:30 pm - 2:58 pm, 3:15 pm - 4:33 pm. Appearances: Jeffrey Zeiger, Gavin Campbell, and Matthew Cavenaugh for Defendant Valaris PLC. Plaintiff Sebastian Miralles Acuna present. Motion4 granted on the record. Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
23 23 1 pgs misc AO435 Transcript Request Wed 08/17 1:42 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Matthew D. Cavenaugh. This is to order a transcript of 8/17/2022 before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts (Filed By Valaris PLC ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew) Electronically forwarded to Access Transcripts, LLC on 8/18/2022. Estimated completion date: 8/19/2022. Modified on 8/18/2022 (RachelWillborg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
22 22 misc Certificate Tue 08/16 1:51 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Sebastian Miralles Acuna ). (SierraThomasAnderson) Modified on 8/16/2022 (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
21 21 2 pgs motion Generic Motion Wed 08/10 3:00 PM
Motion for leave to file a supplemental complaint Filed by Plaintiff Sebastian Miralles Acuna (ckrus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Att: 2 157 pgs Supplemental complaint
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Wed 08/10 1:41 PM
Notice of Change of Address. Per Mr. Miralles' request, the address on file has been updated from "Av Paseo de la Reforma 246, floor 41" to "Av Paseo de la Reforma 296 , Piso 41." (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/29 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Setting Hearing Wed 07/27 4:22 PM
Case Management Order, Signed on 7/27/2022 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2022 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Saturday, November 20, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/20 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Compel
Thursday, November 18, 2021
17 17 3 pgs order Compel Thu 11/18 11:44 AM
Order Denying Motion to Compel Disclosures and Discovery Related [+] Signed on 11/18/2021. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 21 pgs claims Response Wed 11/17 11:10 PM
Supporting Response Related [+]. (Miralles, Sebastian)
Related: [-] 14 Reply
Monday, November 15, 2021
15 15 3 pgs motion Compel Wed 11/17 1:14 PM
Motion to Compel Disclosures and Discovery Filed by Sebastian Miralles Acuna (dhan) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2021 (hcar)
Related: [-]
14 14 19 pgs answer Reply Mon 11/15 4:32 PM
Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Amended Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Valaris PLC (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, November 05, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/05 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/05/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Generic Order
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 11/03 1:27 PM
Order Denying Motion to Summon Luminus Management LLC Pursuant To Fed R. Bankr. P. 7004 Related [+] Signed on 11/3/2021. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
12 12 93 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/03 2:06 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+] (MelissaMorgan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 120 pgs Complaint
Att: 2 114 pgs Complaint Continued
Att: 3 106 pgs Complaint Continued
Att: 4 100 pgs Complaint Continued
Monday, November 01, 2021
10 10 93 pgs claims Reply Mon 11/01 4:18 PM
Amended Reply Related [+].(Miralles, Sebastian)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Order
Att: 1 123 pgs Exhibit 1-5
Att: 2 69 pgs Exhibit 6-10
Att: 3 33 pgs Exhibit 11-15
Att: 4 26 pgs Exhibit 16-20
Att: 5 30 pgs Exhibit 21-25
Att: 6 64 pgs Exhibit 26-30
Att: 7 33 pgs 31-35
Att: 8 33 pgs Exhibit 36-40
Att: 9 17 pgs Exhibit 41-45
Att: 10 11 pgs Exhibit 46-49
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/20 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Order
Monday, October 18, 2021
7 7 2 pgs order Generic Order Mon 10/18 8:12 AM
Case Management Order, Signed on 10/18/2021 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference,4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, October 15, 2021
6 6 43 pgs claims Response Fri 10/15 12:44 PM
Opposition Response Related [+].(Miralles, Sebastian)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order Order Granting Motions
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
8 8 9 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Wed 10/20 10:31 AM
Motion to Summon Luminus Management LLC Persuant To Fed R. Bankr. P. 7004 Filed by Sebastian Miralles Acuna (jdav)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate Mon 09/27 8:57 PM
Certificate of Service re: Valaris PLCs Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint (Docket No.4) (Filed By Stretto ) Related [+] (Stretto)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, September 24, 2021
4 4 25 pgs motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/24 6:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Valaris PLC (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 19 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 3 1 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, September 02, 2021
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/02 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 09/02 4:40 PM
Receipt Number 190617, Fee Amount $350.00 . Related [+]. (than)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 08/31 9:05 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
1 1 133 pgs cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 08/30 5:21 PM
Adversary case 21-03902 Nature of Suit: (51 (Revocation of confirmation)) ,(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)) , (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Adverary Complaint for Injunctive Relief, Civil Penalties, Restitution and Other Equitable Relief by Sebastian Miralles Acuna against Valaris PLC , Luminus Management LLC , Does 1 - 50 . Receipt Number o, Fee Amount $350 (than)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 42 pgs Exhibit C
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit C (White Space)
Att: 3 1 pgs Summary
Att: 4 2 pgs Adversary Cover Sheet