Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 1:21-cv-00562
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2021
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Case in other court:Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, A 2004247
Last checked: Sunday Feb 27, 2022 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
Cottingham Retirement Community Inc
3995 Cottingham Dr.
Cincinnati, OH 45241
Represented By
Kristina Leach
Salsbury & Salsbury Lpa
contact info
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Rochelle Watson
3995 Cottingham Dr.
Cincinnati, OH 45241
Represented By
Kristina Leach
Salsbury & Salsbury Lpa
contact info
Scott Salsbury
Salsbury & Salsbury, L.P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Penny
11388 Lebanon Rd Apt 21
Cincinnati, OH 45241
Represented By
Rose Ann Fleming
contact info

GPO Aug 22 2024
OPINION AND ORDER - the Court GRANTS Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) and Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 42) and DISMISSES Plaintiff Steven Pennys Amended Complaint (Doc. 4) WITH PREJUDICE. Further, the Court notes that there have been several improper, unique, or non-dispositive motions filed during the pendency of this suit. The Court DENIES the following motions as MOOT: Plaintiffs Motion for Finding of Intentional Tort (Doc. 13); Defendants Motion to Strike Errata Sheet (Doc. 27); Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witness (Doc. 30); Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 39); Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct (Doc. 40); and Plaintiffs Motion to File Text Searchable Documents (Doc. 41). Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT and TERMINATE this matter from the docket. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 08/22/2024. (bjc)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 22, 2024
55 55 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 08/22 11:42 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT Affirming54 Opinion and Order signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 08/22/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
54 54 37 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Exclude Thu 08/22 11:33 AM
OPINION AND ORDER - the Court GRANTS Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc.10 ) and Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.42 ) and DISMISSES Plaintiff Steven Pennys Amended Complaint (Doc.4 ) WITH PREJUDICE. Further, the Court notes that there have been several improper, unique, or non-dispositive motions filed during the pendency of this suit. The Court DENIES the following motions as MOOT: Plaintiffs Motion for Finding of Intentional Tort (Doc.13 ); Defendants Motion to Strike Errata Sheet (Doc.27 ); Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witness (Doc.30 ); Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint (Doc.39 ); Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct (Doc.40 ); and Plaintiffs Motion to File Text Searchable Documents (Doc.41 ). Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT and TERMINATE this matter from the docket. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 08/22/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]