Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:21-cv-01290
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2021
Terminated:Sep 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 27, 2022 1:06 AM PST
Defendant
Damerow Ford Co
Represented By
Christopher E. Hawk
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Theophilus Jermany
Represented By
Dana L. Sullivan
Baas Law
contact info
Michael S Meyers
Michael S. Meyers
contact info
Angela M. Ferrer
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
28 28 order Dismissal -Terminate Case Tue 09/06 5:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/6/2022 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Tue 09/06 10:42 AM
Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
25 25 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 06/15 11:03 AM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Damerow Ford Co. (Hawk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 06/15 1:35 PM
ORDER: Granting the parties' third Joint Motion for Extension of Case Deadlines (ECF No.25 ). Fact Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/28/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 12/29/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Expert Reports due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 12/29/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Expert Discovery to be completed 60 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 1/30/2023 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
24 24 notice Attorney Substitution Tue 05/10 2:24 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution: Kelly Fisher is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Michael S Meyers . Filed by Theophilus Jermany. (Fisher, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
23 23 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/26 5:12 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. See attached three-page order. Signed on 4/26/2022 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
minute Discovery Hearing Mon 04/25 5:23 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Discovery Hearing held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 4/25/2022. Formal order to follow. Dana L. Sullivan present as counsel for plaintiff. Christopher E. Hawk present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston, (503) 326-8186. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 04/21 11:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Hearing is set for Monday, 4/25/2022, at 03:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 03/22 3:03 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Meyers, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Tue 03/22 3:51 PM
ORDER: Granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Case Deadlines (ECF No.19 ). Fact Discovery is to be completed by 6/29/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 7/29/2022. Expert reports due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 8/31/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 8/31/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Expert Discovery to be completed 60 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 9/30/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
18 18 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 12/07 8:43 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
17 17 minute Rule 16 Conference Mon 12/06 6:09 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman by telephone on 12/6/2021. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Parties are to amend pleadings or add any additional parties or claims by 2/28/2022. Discovery is to be completed by 4/29/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/31/2022. Expert reports due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 6/30/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due 30 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 6/30/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Expert Discovery to be completed 60 days after final ruling on dispositive motions, or by 7/29/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. ORDER striking Pretrial Order deadline. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. (The consent form is attached.) For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. Dana L. Sullivan and Michael S. Meyers present as counsel for plaintiff. Christopher E. Hawk present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
16 16 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 11/18 8:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, 12/6/2021, at 2:00 PM by telephone. (Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
15 15 notice Attorney Substitution Wed 11/17 8:22 AM
Plaintiff's Notice of Attorney Substitution: Dana L. Sullivan is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Angela M. Ferrer . Filed by Theophilus Jermany. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
14 14 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 11/15 2:18 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No.13 ). Signed on 11/15/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Protective Order Mon 11/15 7:45 AM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Theophilus Jermany. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Mon 10/25 2:10 PM
ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (ECF No.11 ). Initial disclosures are due by 11/15/2021. Discovery is to be completed by 4/29/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/31/2022. Expert Reports and Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report are due 30 days after the Court's ruling on dispositive motions or by 6/30/2022 if no dispositive motions are filed. Expert Discovery to be completed 60 days after the Court's ruling on dispositive motions or by 7/30/2021 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Mon 10/25 10:24 AM
Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Theophilus Jermany. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
10 10 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/28 2:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Damerow Ford Co. (Hawk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 09/28 2:19 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 09/28 1:31 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Damerow Ford Co. (Hawk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/24 4:57 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses . Filed by Damerow Ford Co. (Hawk, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
6 6 order Correction of the Record Thu 09/09 4:34 PM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding4 Summons/Service Return Executed. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
Related: [-]
5 5 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 09/09 4:08 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/02 9:17 AM
Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint Certificate of Service by Theophilus Jermany Filed by Theophilus Jermany. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/31 2:40 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Damerow Ford Co. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 08/31 2:37 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 12/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/28/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/31 1:27 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8214310 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Theophilus Jermany against All Defendants. (Sullivan, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons