New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:21-cv-04914
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 27, 2022 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
Glen Craig
Represented By
Scott Burroughs
Doniger / Burroughs
contact info
Laura Zaharia
Doniger/burroughs
contact info
Eliezer Lekht
Sriplaw
contact info
Joel Benjamin Rothman
Sriplaw
contact info
Plaintiff
Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By
James H. Freeman
Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Kenneth Plevan
Terminated: 01/05/2022
National Advertising Review Board
New York, NY 10003


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 06, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/06 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC without prejudice, both parties to bear their own costs and fees (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/06 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry20 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/6/2022. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 01/05 5:04 PM
REPORT of Mediation Unsettled Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Mediation Report due by 1/19/2022. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Case Returned from Mediation Wed 01/05 5:14 PM
Case returned from mediation. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
adr Selection of Mediator Tue 11/23 9:44 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Kenneth Plevan selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on January 5, 2022. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 1/19/2022. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
minutes Pre Motion Conference Tue 11/09 3:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: James Freeman, Esq. for the plaintiff and Joel Rothman, Esq. & Eliezer Lekht, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Pre-motion conference held on 11/9/2021. Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss and plaintiffs anticipated motion for summary judgment were discussed. All parties agree to court mediation. If the case does not settle in court mediation the court will re-schedule this in person pre-motion conference. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 11/09 3:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 1/9/22.Selection of Mediator due by 11/23/2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/9/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Tue 11/09 3:59 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
19 19 misc Letter Fri 11/05 5:59 AM
Letter in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Adjourn the Conference Scheduled for November 9, 2021 by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Attorney Registration of Rebecca R. Liebowitz, Esq.
order Order(Other) Fri 11/05 8:45 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application18 is DENIED. The in person pre-motion conference scheduled for November 9, 2021 @ 2:30pm will go forward as scheduled. The concerns raised in his letter can be addressed at the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/5/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
18 18 misc Letter Thu 11/04 7:27 PM
Letter Advisory to Court concerning conference on November 9, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. and suspension of Richard Liebowitz from practice of law by Glen Craig (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eliezer Lekht on behalf of Glen Craig (aty to be noticed) (Lekht, Eliezer)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Glen Craig (notification declined or already on case) (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/22 11:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The defendant letter application11 dated 10/14/21 and plaintiff's letter application13 dated 10/21/21 are GRANTED. An in person pre motion conference is scheduled for November 9, 2021 @ 2:30PM. The Court expects the parties to be conversant with the underlying facts and prepared to discuss the legal issues arising therefrom. The parties are reminded that they are obligated to discuss the prospect of settlement and may be required to provide the Court with a report of such discussions . If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this in person pre-motion conference and then file a letter application. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/22/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 10/22 11:54 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/9/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/21 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Glen Craig (aty to be noticed) (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Thu 10/21 2:46 PM
Letter re: Plaintiff's request for a pre-motion conference to file a Rule 56 motion for summary judgment by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Thu 10/21 2:45 PM
Letter in opposition to defendant Glen Craig's request for a pre-motion conference to file a Rule 12 motion by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Thu 10/14 2:36 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference or Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) and (6) by Glen Craig (Rothman, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/17 5:37 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Glen Craig. (Zaharia, Laura)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/17 5:09 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Glen Craig. (Zaharia, Laura)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/17 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Zaharia on behalf of Glen Craig (aty to be noticed) (Zaharia, Laura)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/17 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Burroughs on behalf of Glen Craig (aty to be noticed) (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/17 5:24 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application9 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their application addressed to MJ Merkl who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/17/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/17 6:15 PM
ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer10 , filed on consent, is hereby granted. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 10/14/2021 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 9/17/2021. (Cahn, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/09 8:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC. Glen Craig served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Wed 09/01 9:49 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/01 8:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Glen Craig. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 09/01 8:11 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 09/01 8:10 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/01 8:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/31 11:57 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Glen Craig Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC. (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons