North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:21-cv-00453
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 23, 2022 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By
H. Bernard Tisdale, III
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Smaniotto
Represented By
Michael Glenn Morrison, II
Van Kampen Law PC
contact info
Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Van Kampen Law
contact info
Kathryn Cho Hagerman
Van Kampen Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 22, 2022
21 21 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/22 2:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by U.S. Bank National Association (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Pretrial Order Deadlines Mon 08/22 11:16 AM
ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 09:15 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/22/22. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/01 3:18 PM
ORDER denying 18 parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Amend Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. The parties may file a Joint Stipulation agreeing to the taking of discovery beyond the current to discovery completion deadline on or before June 7, 2022. The parties may stipulate to taking discovery through August 29, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case deadlines remain as follows: mediation report - June 16, 2022; dispositive motions - June 24, 2022; and trial term - September 12-30, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/1/22. (mga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/31 5:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 6/14/2022 (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 18, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Other Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/18 2:24 PM
ORDER granting with modification 16 Amended Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. The case deadlines are revised as follows: discovery completion - by June 7, 2022; dispositive motions - June 24, 2022; mediation report - June 16, 2022; Jury Trial RESET for 9/12-30/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties ' " Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan" (Document No. 15 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/18/22. (mga)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/18 11:42 AM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 4/1/2022 (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
15 15 motion Continue Other Wed 03/09 4:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery, Dispositive and Trial Deadlines by Anthony Smaniotto. Responses due by 3/23/2022 (Van Kampen, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/04 12:37 PM
ORDER granting 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Defendant shall have up to and including January 26, 2022, to respond to Plaintiff's first set of discovery requests, and Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 16, 2022, to respond to Defendant's first set of discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/4/2022. (mek)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/04 11:51 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 1/18/2022 (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 13, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 12/13 7:13 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Glenn Morrison, II terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/13/2021. (mek)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 12/13 3:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anthony Smaniotto. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (Morrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/10 3:55 PM
ORDER granting 9 Joint Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions. Defendant shall have up to and including January 12, 2022, to respond to Plaintiff's first set of discovery requests, and Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 2, 2022, to respond to Defendant's first set of discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/21. (mga)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/10 3:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 08, 2021
8 8 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/08 4:03 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 4 - 5 days. Discovery due by 4/7/2022. Motions due by 5/5/2022. Mediation deadline set for 4/21/2022. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/5/21. (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
7 7 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 10/26 4:42 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 09/28 3:26 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/18/2021. (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/21 4:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association (Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal Tue 09/21 4:37 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint contained in1 Notice of Removal, by U.S. Bank National Association.(Tisdale, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/31 2:31 PM
ORDER granting 3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: complaint contained in the 1 Notice of Removal. U.S. Bank National Association answer due 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/21. (mga)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Tue 08/31 10:03 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
3 3 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/31 10:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Notice of Removal, by U.S. Bank National Association. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/31 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of H. Bernard Tisdale, III on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (dgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 08/31 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court Division, case number 21-cvs-8741. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CHD067188) filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Filings with Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/31 10:02 AM
Case assigned as to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (dgr)
Related: [-]