Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 4:21-cv-00674
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 26, 2022 4:16 AM CST
Appellant
Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC
Represented By
Joyce Williams Lindauer
Joyce W Lindauer Attorney, PLLC
contact info
Appellant
John C. Pappas
Represented By
Gary Dean Corley
Corley Law Firm
contact info
Appellee
Jon Bangash
Represented By
Clayton Lockleer Everett
Everett Legal Services, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Sheryl Denham


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, September 30, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/30 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL; Parties' Agreement for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023. [Dkt. 3]. It is therefore ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is also ORDERED that each party bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. It is further ORDERED that all Court dates and pending deadlines are hereby vacated and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/30/2021. (kls, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
3 3 motion Dismiss Tue 09/28 6:20 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC.(Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/01 2:24 PM
BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 9/1/2021. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 08/31 11:05 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK16-41526. File received via email from Bankruptcy Court,, filed by John C. Pappas, Joyce W. Lindauer.(mcg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Bankruptcy Order on Appeal
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/31 11:07 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (mcg)
Related: [-]
utility Bankruptcy Electronic Record Tue 08/31 11:08 AM
Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (mcg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 08/31 11:08 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mcg)
Related: [-]