New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:21-cv-16395
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2021
Re-opened:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, BER-L-54-00021
Last checked: Monday Feb 28, 2022 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Plaintiff
MICHAEL FASANO
Represented By
PHILIP E. STERN
Difancesco Bateman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
HESSAM NADJI
Terminated: 02/25/2022
Represented By
JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
J.D. PARKER
Terminated: 02/25/2022
Represented By
JOCELYN ANNISE MERCED
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 28, 2023
50 50 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 04/28 5:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. and each to bear its own costs, including attorneys fees. MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC. terminated. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/28/2023. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
49 49 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/27 3:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MARCUS & MILLICHAP REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, INC.. (MERCED, JOCELYN)
Related: [-]